Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2643417

EP2643417 - METHOD AND DAMPING ELEMENT FOR REDUCING THE NATURAL VIBRATION OF A COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.10.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Faist ChemTec GmbH
Weinsheimer Strasse 96
67547 Worms / DE
[2015/32]
Former [2015/28]For all designated states
Faist Chem Tec GmbH
Weinsheimer Strasse 96
67547 Worms / DE
Former [2013/40]For all designated states
Faist ChemTech GmbH
Weinsheimer Strasse 96
67547 Worms / DE
Inventor(s)01 / FUHRMANN, Bernd
Wiesenweg 13
86381 Krumbach / DE
02 / GREVENER, Christoph
Hauffstrasse 6
75391 Gechingen / DE
03 / HARDT, Christian
Kirschenallee 35
65451 Kelsterbach / DE
04 / KORNACKI, Zdislaw
Wertheimer Strasse 3
61130 Niederau-Heldenbergen / DE
05 / LAWRENCE, Petra
Hölderlin Strasse 6
71134 Aidlingen / DE
06 / OBST, Heike Ursula
Dieselstrasse 455
67551 Worms / DE
07 / PATSOURAS, Dimitrios
Wed 3
65929 Frankfurt-Höchst / DE
 [2013/40]
Representative(s)Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Bavariaring 11
80336 München / DE
[2015/09]
Former [2013/40]Müller Schupfner & Partner
Bavariaring 11
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date11791245.122.11.2011
WO2011EP70626
Priority number, dateDE2010105241724.11.2010         Original published format: DE102010052417
[2013/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012069445
Date:31.05.2012
Language:DE
[2012/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2643417
Date:02.10.2013
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2012
[2013/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2643417
Date:25.02.2015
Language:DE
[2015/09]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2643417
Date:15.07.2015
[2015/29]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2643417
Date:25.11.2015
[2015/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:B60R13/08, G10K11/16
[2014/39]
Former International [2013/40]C09J7/02, B60R13/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND DÄMPFUNGSELEMENT ZUR REDUZIERUNG DER EIGENSCHWINGUNGEN EINES BAUTEILS[2013/40]
English:METHOD AND DAMPING ELEMENT FOR REDUCING THE NATURAL VIBRATION OF A COMPONENT[2013/40]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET ÉLÉMENT D'AMORTISSEMENT DESTINÉS À RÉDUIRE LES VIBRATIONS PROPRES D'UN ÉLÉMENT[2013/40]
Entry into regional phase17.05.2013National basic fee paid 
17.05.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
17.05.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.09.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/40]
15.09.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.01.2015Fee for grant paid
12.01.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.01.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.09.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.11.2015  30.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Wagner Albiger & Partner Patentanwälte mbB, et al
Siegfried-Leopold-Straße 27
53225 Bonn / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2017/32]
Opponent(s)01  25.11.2015  30.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Wagner Albiger & Partner Patentanwälte mbB, et al
Siegfried-Leopold-Strasse 27
53225 Bonn / DE
Former [2016/01]
Opponent(s)01  25.11.2015  30.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
08.01.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.08.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
04.10.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.10.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition22.11.2017Appeal received No.  T2539/17
08.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL25.02.2015
BG25.02.2015
CY25.02.2015
DK25.02.2015
EE25.02.2015
FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
MC25.02.2015
MK25.02.2015
MT25.02.2015
NL25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
RS25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
SM25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
PT29.08.2015
IE22.11.2015
LU22.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
AT22.11.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]BG25.02.2015
CY25.02.2015
DK25.02.2015
EE25.02.2015
FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
MC25.02.2015
MK25.02.2015
MT25.02.2015
NL25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
RS25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
SM25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
PT29.08.2015
IE22.11.2015
LU22.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
AT22.11.2016
Former [2018/10]BG25.02.2015
CY25.02.2015
DK25.02.2015
EE25.02.2015
FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
MC25.02.2015
MT25.02.2015
NL25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
RS25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
SM25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
PT29.08.2015
IE22.11.2015
LU22.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
AT22.11.2016
Former [2017/39]BG25.02.2015
CY25.02.2015
DK25.02.2015
EE25.02.2015
FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
MC25.02.2015
MT25.02.2015
NL25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
RS25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
SM25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
PT29.08.2015
IE22.11.2015
LU22.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/45]DK25.02.2015
EE25.02.2015
FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
MC25.02.2015
NL25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
RS25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
PT29.08.2015
IE22.11.2015
LU22.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/34]DK25.02.2015
EE25.02.2015
FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
MC25.02.2015
NL25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
RS25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
PT29.08.2015
LU22.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/31]DK25.02.2015
EE25.02.2015
FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
MC25.02.2015
NL25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
RS25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
PT29.08.2015
LU22.11.2015
Former [2016/28]DK25.02.2015
EE25.02.2015
FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
MC25.02.2015
NL25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
RS25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
PT29.08.2015
Former [2015/49]DK25.02.2015
EE25.02.2015
FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
NL25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
RS25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
PT29.08.2015
Former [2015/41]FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
NL25.02.2015
RS25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
Former [2015/39]FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
RS25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
Former [2015/38]FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
IS25.06.2015
Former [2015/37]FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
GR26.05.2015
Former [2015/36]FI25.02.2015
HR25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
SE25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
Former [2015/35]LT25.02.2015
NO25.05.2015
Cited inInternational search[XP]DE102010049107  (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [XP] 6-8 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0031] * * claims 1, 2, 3 *;
 [XDI]DE102008050772  (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [XD] 6-8 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0015] * * claims 1, 5, 6 * [I] 1-5
ExaminationEP0542201
 DE10336842
by applicantDE102008050772