EP2578882 - UNIAXIAL ECCENTRIC SCREW PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NETZSCH Pumpen & Systeme GmbH Gebrüder-Netzsch-Strasse 19 95100 Selb / DE | For all designated states Heishin Ltd. 1-1-54 Misakihonmachi Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 652-0852 / JP | [2020/04] |
Former [2013/15] | For all designated states NETZSCH Pumpen & Systeme GmbH Gebrüder-Netzsch-Strasse 19 95100 Selb / DE | ||
For all designated states Heishin Ltd. 1-1-54 Misakihonmachi Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 652-0852 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIMA, Takashi 2-5-3-209, Yamamoto-dori Chuo-ku Kobe 650-0003 / JP | 02 /
OGAWA, Masaki 1-2-803, Kanebo-cho Nagahama, 526-0068 / JP | [2013/25] |
Former [2013/15] | 01 /
HASHIMA, Takashi / JP | ||
02 /
OGAWA, Masaki / JP | Representative(s) | Beyer, Andreas, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/04] | Beyer, Andreas, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/26] | Beyer, Andreas, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11792269.0 | 23.05.2011 | [2020/04] | WO2011JP61711 | Priority number, date | JP20100130396 | 07.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010130396 | [2013/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011155312 | Date: | 15.12.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2578882 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2578882 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | [2017/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2578882 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F04C2/107 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
F04C2/1075 (EP,US);
F04C15/00 (KR);
F04D3/02 (US);
F04C11/00 (KR);
F04C2/02 (KR);
F04C2/08 (KR);
F04C2/10 (KR);
F04C2/107 (KR);
F04C2/165 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONOAXIALE EXZENTERSCHNECKENPUMPE | [2013/15] | English: | UNIAXIAL ECCENTRIC SCREW PUMP | [2013/15] | French: | POMPE À VIS EXCENTRIQUE UNIAXE | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2013 | Translation filed | 07.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 20.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 25.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/53] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 23.02.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 23.02.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.03.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.05.2011 | AL | 22.01.2020 | AT | 22.01.2020 | CY | 22.01.2020 | CZ | 22.01.2020 | DK | 22.01.2020 | EE | 22.01.2020 | ES | 22.01.2020 | FI | 22.01.2020 | HR | 22.01.2020 | LT | 22.01.2020 | LV | 22.01.2020 | MC | 22.01.2020 | MK | 22.01.2020 | MT | 22.01.2020 | NL | 22.01.2020 | PL | 22.01.2020 | RO | 22.01.2020 | RS | 22.01.2020 | SE | 22.01.2020 | SI | 22.01.2020 | SK | 22.01.2020 | SM | 22.01.2020 | TR | 22.01.2020 | BG | 22.04.2020 | NO | 22.04.2020 | GR | 23.04.2020 | IS | 22.05.2020 | IE | 23.05.2020 | LU | 23.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | PT | 14.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 23.05.2011 | |
AL | 22.01.2020 | ||
AT | 22.01.2020 | ||
CY | 22.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
MT | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
IE | 23.05.2020 | ||
LU | 23.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 23.05.2011 | |
AT | 22.01.2020 | ||
CY | 22.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
MT | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
IE | 23.05.2020 | ||
LU | 23.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
IE | 23.05.2020 | ||
LU | 23.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
IE | 23.05.2020 | ||
LU | 23.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
IE | 23.05.2020 | ||
LU | 23.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
LU | 23.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 22.01.2020 | |
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 22.01.2020 | |
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 22.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US3011445 (DAVID BOURKE JOHN); | [XI]US3084631 (DAVID BOURKE JOHN); | [XI]DE2529916 (DAUNHEIMER ERICH); | [XI]US5318416 (HANTSCHK GUENTHER [DE], et al); | [XI]JP2006249931 (HEISHIN ENG & EQUIPMENT CO LTD); | [Y]JP2007071208 (NETZSCH MOHNOPUMPEN GMBH) | International search | [A]JPS4848206U ; | [Y]JPS52159409U ; | [X]JPS56118987U ; | [X]DE3503604 (GUMMI JAEGER KG GMBH & CIE [DE]); | [Y]JP2005076760 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD); | [Y]JP2007071208 (NETZSCH MOHNOPUMPEN GMBH); | [A]JP2008509313 ; | [XP]JP2010168991 (HEISHIN ENGINEERING & EQUIPMENT CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2005344587 |