EP2581467 - METAL PIPE FOR VEHICLE PIPING AND SURFACE TREATMENT METHOD FOR PIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2022 | Opposition rejected | published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanoh Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-23-23, Ebisu Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150 0013 / JP | [2013/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KON Takanori c/o Sanoh Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 758 Konosu Koga-shi Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | 02 /
OZAWA Juichi c/o Sanoh Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 758 Konosu Koga-shi Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | 03 /
OMOTE Kazuyuki c/o Sanoh Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 758 Konosu Koga-shi Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2013/16] | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11792407.6 | 06.06.2011 | [2020/18] | WO2011JP62948 | Priority number, date | JP20100131996 | 09.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010131996 | [2013/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011155450 | Date: | 15.12.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2581467 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2581467 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C23C2/06, C23C2/02, C23C2/14, C23C2/38 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
F16L9/02 (US);
C23C2/0035 (EP,US);
C23C2/00362 (EP,US);
C23C2/0038 (EP,US);
C23C2/02 (EP,US);
C23C2/0222 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/09] | C23C2/06, C23C2/02, C23C2/14, C23C2/38, F16L9/02 | ||
Former IPC [2013/16] | C23C2/06, C23C2/02, C23C2/14, C23C2/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METALLROHR FÜR FAHRZEUGROHRLEITUNGEN UND OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR ROHRE | [2013/16] | English: | METAL PIPE FOR VEHICLE PIPING AND SURFACE TREATMENT METHOD FOR PIPE | [2013/16] | French: | TUYAU DE MÉTAL POUR CANALISATIONS DE VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE CORRESPONDANT | [2013/16] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2012 | Translation filed | 07.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 07.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 10.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.12.2020
TI Automotive (Heidelberg) GmbH Dischinger Strasse 11 69123 Heidelberg / DE Opponent's representative Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [2021/03] | 18.02.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.06.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.09.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.02.2022 | 22.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.04.2022 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2022/42] | 12.04.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.06.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.06.2022 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.06.2011 | AL | 29.04.2020 | AT | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | CZ | 29.04.2020 | DK | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | ES | 29.04.2020 | FI | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | IT | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | MK | 29.04.2020 | MT | 29.04.2020 | NL | 29.04.2020 | PL | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | RS | 29.04.2020 | SE | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | IE | 06.06.2020 | LU | 06.06.2020 | FR | 29.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | GB | 29.07.2020 | NO | 29.07.2020 | GR | 30.07.2020 | IS | 29.08.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 06.06.2011 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
MT | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
FR | 29.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GB | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
FR | 29.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GB | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GB | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02133558 (SAN O IND CO) [A] 1,5 * abstract *; | [A]JPH08283925 (NIHON PARKERIZING) [A] 1,5,8 * abstract *; | [A]JP2002167657 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1,5* abstract *; | [A]JP2003055750 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD) [A] 1,2,5,6 * abstract *; | [XI]JP2003166078 (MARUYASU & CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 15] , [0 16] , [0 21] , [0 29] , [0 32]; claim 10 * [I] 5-9,11; | [A]US6686058 (YOSHIDA YUICHIRO [JP]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2006037207 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD, et al) [A] 1,5 * paragraph [0021] * | International search | [Y]JPH0199707 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [Y]JPH02133558 (SAN O IND CO); | [Y]JPH08283925 (NIHON PARKERIZING); | [X]JP2003055750 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD); | [X]JP2003166078 (MARUYASU & CO LTD); | [X]JP2006037207 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2007070729 (KOREA BUNDY CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH08197635 | Opposition | EP0106021 | EP0546790 | US5520223 | JP2003055750 | JP2003166078 | EP2017074 | US7534502 | WO2009069614 | US2010065160 |