Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2580378

EP2580378 - METHODS AND COMPOSITION FOR MULTIPLEX SEQUENCING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.11.2014
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.12.2014  [2014/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nugen Technologies, Inc.
201 Industrial Road, Suite 310
San Carlos, CA 94070 / US
[2013/16]
Inventor(s)01 / RAYMOND, Christopher
2626 Ne 86th Street
Seattle WA 98115 / US
02 / KURN, Nurith
2876 Ramona Street
Palo Alto CA 94306 / US
03 / MAGNUS, Jill
11528 39th Avenue Northeast
Seattle WA 98125 / US
 [2013/16]
Representative(s)Roques, Sarah Elizabeth , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[2013/16]
Application number, filing date11793123.808.06.2011
WO2011US39683
Priority number, dateUS20100352801P08.06.2010         Original published format: US 352801 P
[2013/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011156529
Date:15.12.2011
Language:EN
[2011/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2580378
Date:17.04.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2011
[2013/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.03.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:C40B40/06, C40B30/00, C40B30/04, C07H21/02, C12Q1/68
[2014/01]
Former International [2013/16]C40B40/06, C40B30/00, C40B30/04, C07H21/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR MULTIPLEX-SEQUENZIERUNG[2013/16]
English:METHODS AND COMPOSITION FOR MULTIPLEX SEQUENCING[2013/16]
French:MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITION DE SÉQUENÇAGE MULTIPLEX[2013/16]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2013National basic fee paid 
07.01.2013Search fee paid 
07.01.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/16]
07.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.06.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/52]
05.08.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201404   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]WO2010030683  (ROSETTA INPHARMATICS LLC [US]; RAYMOND CHRISTOPHER K [US]) [X] 1,4,6,7,9-12,14,15 * the whole document * * figure 1; example 1 * * page 12, line 24 - line 25 * * page 13, line 14 - line 15 * * page 47, line 21 - line 25 * * page 10, line 14 - page 11, line 8 * * page 12, line 24 - page 13, line 2 * * page 15, line 10 - line 25 * * page 23, line 18 - line 27; examples 6-8 * [Y] 2,3,5,8 [I] 13;
 [Y]US2009203085  (KURN NURITH [US] ET AL) [Y] 2,3 * the whole document * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0102]; figure 3 *;
 [E]WO2012103154  (NUGEN TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]; KURN NURITH [US]; STAPLETON MARK [US]; WA) [E] 1-4,6,7,9-12,14,15 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - MEYER MATTHIAS ET AL, "Parallel tagged sequencing on the 454 platform", NATURE PROTOCOLS, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20080101), vol. 3, no. 2, doi:10.1038/NPROT.2007.520, ISSN 1750-2799, pages 267 - 278, XP001538264 [Y] 8 * the whole document * * page 267, column r, line 20 - line 24; figure 1a IV *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nprot.2007.520
 [Y]  - VARLEY KATHERINE ELENA ET AL, "Nested Patch PCR enables highly multiplexed mutation discovery in candidate genes", GENOME RESEARCH, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, WOODBURY, NY, US, vol. 18, no. 11, doi:10.1101/GR.078204.108, ISSN 1088-9051, (20081101), pages 1844 - 1850, URL: http://genome.cshlp.org/content/18/11/1844, (20081010), XP002678933 [Y] 5 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/GR.078204.108
International search[Y]US4942124  (CHURCH);
 [A]US2010113296  (MYERSON);
 [AP]US2010323348  (HAMADY ET AL.)
 [X]  - DANIEL N. FRANK, "BARCRAWL and BARTAB: software tools for the design and implementation of barcoded primers for highly multiplexed DNA sequencing. ART 362", BMC BIOINFORMATICS, (2009), vol. 10, pages 1 - 13, XP021061890

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2105-10-362