Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2665552

EP2665552 - CROSS-LINKED CARBON NANOTUBE NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU, MC
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Bio Nano Centre Limited
The Gridiron Building
One Pancras Square
London
N1C 4AG / GB
For all designated states
King Abdulaziz University
PO Box 80203
Jeddah 21589 / SA
[2015/24]
Former [2014/21]For all designated states
The Bio Nano Centre Limited
338 Euston Road
London NW1 3BT / GB
For all designated states
King Abdulaziz University
PO Box 80203
Jeddah 21589 / SA
Former [2013/48]For all designated states
Bio Nano Consulting
338 Euston Road
London, Greater London NW1 3BT / GB
For all designated states
King Abdulaziz University
PO Box 80203
Jeddah 21589 / SA
Inventor(s)01 / SHAFFER, Milo
Department of Chemistry
Imperial College London
South Kensington Campus
London Greater London SW7 2AZ / GB
02 / GARCIA GALLASTEGUI, Ainara
Department of Chemistry
Imperial College London
South Kensington Campus
London Greater London SW7 2AZ / GB
03 / ASIRI, Abdullah
Chemistry Department
Faculty of Science
King Abdulaziz University
PO Box 80203, Jeddah
21589 / SA
04 / AL-THABAITI, Shaeel
Chemistry Department
Faculty of Science
King Abdulaziz University
PO Box 80203, Jeddah
21589 / SA
 [2013/48]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2016/44]
Former [2013/48]Clarke, Lionel Paul
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Application number, filing date11793481.015.11.2011
[2016/44]
WO2011GB52224
Priority number, dateGB2011000071217.01.2011         Original published format: GB 201100712
[2013/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012098345
Date:26.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/30]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2665552
Date:27.11.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2012
[2013/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2665552
Date:02.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/44]
Search report(s)International search reportEP11.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:B01J13/00
[2013/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERNETZTE KOHLENSTOFFNANORÖHRENNETZWERKE[2013/48]
English:CROSS-LINKED CARBON NANOTUBE NETWORKS[2013/48]
French:RÉSEAUX DE NANOTUBES DE CARBONE RÉTICULÉS[2013/48]
Entry into regional phase12.07.2013National basic fee paid 
12.07.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
12.07.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/48]
04.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
10.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2016Fee for grant paid
23.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.09.2015
Opposition(s)03.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipEE02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
[2017/43]
Former [2017/38]EE02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/37]EE02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/26]HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV02.11.2016
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2010187484  (WORSLEY MARCUS A [US], et al) [X] 1,19,21-23,26,27,30,32,33,35 * claims 1, 5, 13, 14, 15, 18 * * paragraphs [0006] , [ 0008] , [ 0038] , [ 0041] * [I] 2-18,20,24,25,31,34,36;
 [XI]US2010190639  (WORSLEY MARCUS A [US], et al) [X] 1,19,22,26 * paragraphs [0027] , [ 0030] , [ 0051] * [I] 2-18,20,21,23-25,27,30-36;
 [A]WO2008034939  (NATUCELL AY [FI], et al) [A] 1-27,30-36 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2910458  (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]) [A] 1-27,30-36 * the whole document *
 [XDI]  - WORSLEY M A ET AL, "Properties of single-walled carbon nanotube-based aerogels as a function of nanotube loading", ACTA MATERIALIA, ELSEVIER, OXFORD, GB, vol. 57, no. 17, doi:10.1016/J.ACTAMAT.2009.07.012, ISSN 1359-6454, (20091001), pages 5131 - 5136, (20090806), XP026601044 [XD] 1,19,22,26,27,30 * page 5131 - page 5133 * * page 5136 * [I] 2-18,20,21,23-25,31-36

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.actamat.2009.07.012
by applicant   - BYRNING M. B.; MILKIE D. E.; ISLAM M. F.; HOUGH L. A.; KIKKAWA J. M.; YODH A. G., "Carbon Nanotube Aerogels", ADV. MATER., (2007), vol. 19, page 661,
    - WORSLEY M. A.; PAUZAUSKIE P. J.; KUCHEYEV S. O.; ZAUG J. M.; HAMZA A. V.; SATCHER JR. J. H.; BAUMANN T. F., "Properties of Single-Walled Carbon Nanotube-Based Aerogels as a Function of Nanotube Loading", ACTA MATERIALIA, (2009), vol. 57, doi:doi:10.1016/j.actamat.2009.07.012, page 5131, XP026601044

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.actamat.2009.07.012
    - OGINO S.; SATO Y.; YAMAMOTO G.; SASAMORI K.; KIMURA H.; HASHIDA T.; MOTOMIYA K.; JEYADEVAN B.; TOHJI K., "Relation of the Number of Cross-Links and Mechanical Properties of Multi-Walled Carbon Nanotube Films Formed by a Dehydration Condensation Reaction", J. PHYS. CHEM., (2006), vol. 110, page 23159,
    - LIU C. ET AL., "Gelation in Carbon Nanotube/Polymer Composites", POLYMER, (2003), vol. 44, doi:doi:10.1016/j.polymer.2003.09.013, pages 7529 - 7532, XP004467321

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymer.2003.09.013
    - CHEN Y.; HADDON R. C.; FANG S.; RAO A. M.; EKLUND P. C.; LEE W. H.; DICKEY E. C.; GRULKE E. A.; PENDERGRASS J. C.; CHAVAN A., "Chemical Attachment of Organic Functional Groups to Single-Walled Carbon Nanotube Material", J. MATER. RES., (1998), vol. 13, page 2423,
    - PEKKER, S.; SALVETAT J.-P.; JAKAB E.; BONARD J.-M.; FORRO L. J., "Hydrogenation of Carbon Nanotubes and Graphite in Liquid Ammonia", PHYS. CHEM. B, (2001), vol. 105, doi:doi:10.1021/jp010642o, page 7938, XP002326110

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp010642o
    - PENICAUD A.; POULIN P.; DERRE A.; ANGLARET E.; PETIT P., "Spontaneous Dissolution of a Single-Wall Carbon Nanotube Salt", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2005), vol. 127, doi:doi:10.1021/ja0443373, page 8, XP002608776

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja0443373
    - WEI L.; ZHANG Y., "Covalent Sidewall Functionalization of Single-Walled Carbon Nanotubes via One-Electron Reduction of Benzophenone by Potassium", CHEM. PHYS. LETT., (2007), vol. 446, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cplett.2007.08.048, page 142, XP022247713

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cplett.2007.08.048
    - GARCIA-GALLASTEGUI A.; OBIETA I.; BUSTERO I.; IMBULUZQUETA G.; ARBIOL J.; MIRANDA J. I.; AIZPURUA J. M., "Reductive Functionalization of Single-Walled Carbon Nanotubes with Lithium Metal Catalyzed by Electron Carrier Additives", CHEM. MATER., (2008), vol. 20, page 4433,
    - FOGDEN S.; VERDEJO R.; COTTAM B.; SHAFFER M., "Purification of Single Walled Carbon Nanotubes: The Problem with Oxidation Debris", CHEM. PHYS. LETT., (2008), vol. 460, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cplett.2008.05.069, pages 162 - 167, XP022851705

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cplett.2008.05.069
    - VERDEJO R.; LAMORINIERE S.; COTTAM B.; BISMARCK A.; SHAFFER M., "Removal of Oxidation Debris from Multi-Walled Carbon Nanotubes", CHEM. COMMUN., (2006), pages 513 - 515,
    - BERGIN S. D.; NICOLOSI V.; STREICH P. 3; GIORDANI S.; SUN Z. 1; WINDLE A.H. 4; RYAN P. 5; NIRMALRAJ P.P.N. 5; WANG Z.T. 4; CARPENT, "Towards Solutions of Single Walled Carbon Nanotubes in Common Solvents", ADVANCED MATERIALS, (2008), vol. 20, no. 10, page 1876,