Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2652912

EP2652912 - CONTENT SHARING BETWEEN A UNIVERSAL PLUG AND PLAY DEVICE AND A WIDE AREA NETWORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2016
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Motorola Mobility LLC
600 North US Highway 45
Libertyville, IL 60048-5343 / US
[N/P]
Former [2013/43]For all designated states
Motorola Mobility LLC
600 North US Highway 45
Libertyville, IL 60048 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MCINERNEY, John
3190 Whip-Poor-Will Lane
Belvidere, Illinois 61008 / US
02 / NASCIMENTO, Fernando Luis
Estr. Rhodia-CND. Lago Serena
13085 Campinas / BR
 [2013/43]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/24]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2013/43]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Grays Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date11793601.318.11.2011
WO2011US61325
Priority number, dateUS2010096600513.12.2010         Original published format: US 966005
[2013/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012082309
Date:21.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2652912
Date:23.10.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2012
[2013/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2652912
Date:10.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28, H04N21/436
[2013/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:GEMEINSAME INHALTSNUTZUNG ZWISCHEN EINEM UNIVERSAL PLUG AND PLAY-GERÄT UND EINEM WIDE AREA NETZWERKGERÄT[2015/03]
English:CONTENT SHARING BETWEEN A UNIVERSAL PLUG AND PLAY DEVICE AND A WIDE AREA NETWORK DEVICE[2013/43]
French:PARTAGE DE CONTENU ENTRE UN DISPOSITIF UNIVERSAL PLUG AND PLAY ET UN DISPOSITIF RÉSEAU ÉTENDU[2015/03]
Former [2013/43]GEMEINSAME INHALTSNUTZUNG ZWISCHEN EINER UNIVERSELLEN PLUG-AND-PLAY-VORRICHTUNG UND EINER WAN-VORRICHTUNG
Former [2013/43]PARTAGE DE CONTENU DANS SERVICE UPNP ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU ÉTENDU
Entry into regional phase25.06.2013National basic fee paid 
25.06.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/43]
18.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.04.2015Fee for grant paid
27.04.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.04.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.12.2014
Opposition(s)11.03.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.11.2011
AL10.06.2015
AT10.06.2015
BE10.06.2015
CY10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
HR10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
MK10.06.2015
MT10.06.2015
NL10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SE10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
SM10.06.2015
TR10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
IE18.11.2015
LU18.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
[2018/47]
Former [2018/31]HU18.11.2011
AT10.06.2015
BE10.06.2015
CY10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
HR10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
MK10.06.2015
MT10.06.2015
NL10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SE10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
SM10.06.2015
TR10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
IE18.11.2015
LU18.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2017/39]HU18.11.2011
AT10.06.2015
BE10.06.2015
CY10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
HR10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
MT10.06.2015
NL10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SE10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
SM10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
IE18.11.2015
LU18.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2017/03]AT10.06.2015
BE10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
IE18.11.2015
LU18.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/45]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
IE18.11.2015
LU18.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/34]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
LU18.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/31]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
LU18.11.2015
Former [2016/28]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/24]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/21]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/20]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/11]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/09]EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
Former [2015/50]ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
Former [2015/49]ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]EP1276296  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,8 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007]; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP1809005  (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [A] 1,8 * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0037] *