Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2741904

EP2741904 - AN ADJUSTABLE EXTRUSION DIE AND A METHOD FOR EXTRUDING A PIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.06.2015
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2017Change - prioritypublished on 19.04.2017  [2017/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ashirvad Pipes Private Limited
4-B Attibele Industrial Area
Hosur Road
Bangalore 562 107
KRN / IN
[2015/02]
Former [2014/25]For all designated states
Poddar, Deepak
102 Redwood Block
Raheja Residency
Koramangala 3rd Block
Bangalore, Karnataka 560 034 / IN
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/25]
Representative(s)Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
[2014/25]
Application number, filing date11793869.604.11.2011
WO2011IB54915
Priority number, dateIN2011CHE273710.08.2011         Original published format: IN 2737CH2011
[2017/16]
Former [2014/25]IN2011CHE273710.08.2011
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013021245
Date:14.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2741904
Date:18.06.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2013
[2014/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:B29C47/22, B29C47/92, B29C47/08
[2014/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/25]
TitleGerman:VERSTELLBARE EXTRUSIONSDÜSE UND VERFAHREN ZUM EXTRUDIEREN EINES ROHRES[2014/25]
English:AN ADJUSTABLE EXTRUSION DIE AND A METHOD FOR EXTRUDING A PIPE[2014/25]
French:FILIÈRE D'EXTRUSION RÉGLABLE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR EXTRUDER UN TUBE[2014/25]
Entry into regional phase18.02.2014National basic fee paid 
18.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/25]
15.01.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/29]
23.02.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the invitation to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability not received in time  [2015/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201404   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1837156  (FEUERHERM HARALD [DE]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * claims 1-15 * * figures 5-7 *;
 [X]EP0885711  (FEUERHERM HARALD [DE]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * claims 1-26 * * figures 1-7 *;
 [X]EP1063074  (FEUERHERM HARALD [DE]) [X] 1,3-8 * paragraph [0019] * * figure 3 *;
 [X]EP0945245  (FEUERHERM HARALD [DE]) [X] 1,3-8 * abstract * * claims 1-17 * * figure 8 *;
 [A]US5102602  (ZIEGLER WILLIAM E [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * figures 2,5,6 *;
 [A]JPS61193822  (TIGERS POLYMER) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * figures 1-2 *