Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785559

EP2785559 - LOCKOUT MECHANISM FOR FOLDABLE HEAD REST [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kongsberg Interior Systems II, Inc.
27275 Haggerty Road, Suite 610
Novi, MI 48377 / US
[2016/33]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
Kongsberg Automotive Inc.
27275 Haggarty Road
Novi, MI 48377 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DEFOREST, Jason
821 Ridgemont Avenue
Commerce, MI 48382 / US
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstraße 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/19]Uexküll & Stolberg
Patentanwälte
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2014/41]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date11794377.902.12.2011
[2016/19]
WO2011US63093
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013081630
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785559
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2785559
Date:11.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60N2/48, B60N2/00
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SPERRMECHANISMUS FÜR FALTBARE KOPFSTÜTZE[2014/41]
English:LOCKOUT MECHANISM FOR FOLDABLE HEAD REST[2014/41]
French:MÉCANISME DE VERROUILLAGE POUR APPUI-TÊTE PLIABLE[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase09.05.2014National basic fee paid 
09.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
16.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.03.2016Fee for grant paid
30.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.06.2015
Opposition(s)14.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL11.05.2016
AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
BG11.05.2016
CY11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IS11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
MK11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
TR11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
IE02.12.2016
LU02.12.2016
MT02.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
BG11.05.2016
CY11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IS11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
MK11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
TR11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
IE02.12.2016
LU02.12.2016
MT02.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/43]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
BG11.05.2016
CY11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IS11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
MK11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
IE02.12.2016
LU02.12.2016
MT02.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/38]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
BG11.05.2016
CY11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IS11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
MK11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
IE02.12.2016
LU02.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/31]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CY11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IS11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
MK11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
IE02.12.2016
LU02.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/49]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
IE02.12.2016
LU02.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/37]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/12]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]US2008296950  (WIECLAWSKI STANISLAW ANDRZEJ [DE]) [A] 1,12,17 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2004195892  (DANIELS ANDREW R [CA]) [A] 1,12,17 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036] *
ExaminationEP1612099
 US5105132
 DE10216705