Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2453605

EP2453605 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING CONTROL INFORMATION AND DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.11.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-Gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2018/14]
Former [2012/20]For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yeouido-dong
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / YANG, Suckchel
LG Institute
533 Hogye 1(il)-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
02 / KIM, Mingyu
LG Institute
533 Hogye 1(il)-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
03 / AHN, Joonkui
LG Institute
533 Hogye 1(il)-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
04 / SEO, Dongyoun
LG Institute
533 Hogye 1(il)-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
 [2012/20]
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/20]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date11795987.416.06.2011
WO2011KR04432
Priority number, dateUS20100379737P03.09.2010         Original published format: US 379737 P
US20100365747P19.07.2010         Original published format: US 365747 P
US20100355544P16.06.2010         Original published format: US 355544 P
[2012/20]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011159121
Date:22.12.2011
Language:KO
[2011/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2453605
Date:16.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR05.04.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/18, H04L5/00, H04L27/26, H04B7/26
[2016/31]
Former International [2012/20]H04L1/18, H04L27/26, H04B7/26
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/20]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON STEUERINFORMATIONEN UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2012/20]
English:METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING CONTROL INFORMATION AND DEVICE THEREFOR[2012/20]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS DE COMMANDE ET DISPOSITIF CORRESPONDANT[2012/20]
Entry into regional phase10.02.2012Translation filed 
10.02.2012National basic fee paid 
10.02.2012Search fee paid 
10.02.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
10.02.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/20]
19.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)EP14162475.9  / EP2750320
EP14162504.6  / EP2750321
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.10.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
19.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[E]EP2717531  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [E] 1-15 * paragraphs [0056] - [0125]; table 13 *;
 [XP]  - ZTE, "Mapping table for Format 1b with Channel Selection", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-105453 MAPPING TABLE FOR FORMAT 1B WITH CHANNEL SELECTION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20101005), vol. RAN WG1, no. Xi'an, China; 20101011 - 201010, XP050598745 [XP] 1-15 * Section 3;; table 4 *
 [XP]  - LG ELECTRONICS, "Correction to table for TDD mode b with M=2", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-111617 MODE B TABLE CORRECTION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110503), vol. RAN WG1, no. Barcelona, Spain; 20110509, XP050491260 [XP] 1-15 * Section 10.1.3.2.1 *
 [I]  - PANASONIC, "Support of UL ACK/NACK channel selection for carrier aggregation", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-102856, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100504), vol. RAN WG1, no. Montreal, Canada; 20100510, XP050420006 [I] 1-15 * Section 2;; figure 5 *
 [AP]  - SAMSUNG, "UL HARQ-ACK Multiplexing: Mapping for 4 Bits", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-104577 A_N MUX MAPPING FOR 4 BITS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100817), vol. RAN WG1, no. Madrid, Spain; 20100823, XP050449873 [AP] 1-15 * Section 2 *
 [A]  - PANASONIC ET AL, "ACK/NACK scrambling scheme on PUCCH", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-083335, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080825), no. Jeju; 20080825, XP050316730 [A] 1-15 * Section 5.4.1 *
 [A]  - SAMSUNG, "Further consideration on ACK/NACK multiplexing in TDD", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-083905, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20081006), no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20081006, XP050317216 [A] 1-15 * Section 2 and 3.1 *
 [A]  - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS ET AL, "DTX detection in case of simultaneous transmission of SR and ACK/NACK", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-081456, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080326), vol. RAN WG1, no. Shenzhen, China; 20080326, XP050109873 [A] 1-15 * Sections 2 and 3 *
International search[A]  - LG ELECTRONICS, "ACK/NACK resource allocation in LTE-A", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #61, R1-103397, MONTREAL, CANADA, (20100510), XP050420457
 [A]  - LG ELECTRONICS, "Uplink ACK/NACK resource allocation in TDD", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #52BIS, R1-081257, SHENZHEN, CHINA, (20080331), XP050109699
 [A]  - MOTOROLA, "Uplink ACK/NACK for Carrier Aggregation", 3GPP TSG RAN1#60, R1-101468, SAN FRANCISCO, USA, (20100222), XP050418926