Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2583180

EP2583180 - MAP-REDUCE READY DISTRIBUTED FILE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2013
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mapr Technologies Inc.
2860 Zanker Road, Suite 290
San Jose, CA 95134 / US
[N/P]
Former [2013/17]For all designated states
Mapr Technologies Inc.
2860 Zanker Road, Suite 290
San Jose, CA 95148 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SRIVAS, Mandayam, C.
33756 Trailside Way
Union City CA 94587 / US
02 / RAVINDRA, Pindikura
Plot 22
Neelima Greens
Near Pragathi Enclave
Hyderabad Andhrs Pradesh 500049 / IN
03 / SARADHI, Uppaluri, Vijaya
Plot 6-90/c
D.no: 6-92/1/2
Chandanagar Hyderabad 500050 / IN
04 / PANDE, Arvind, Arun
402 Raheja Crest Bldg. No.1
Oshiwara
Andheri West
Mumbai
Maharashtra 400053 / IN
05 / SANAPALA, Chndra Garu, Kiran Babu
Plot 900
Vasanthanagar
Kphb
Kukatpally
Hyderabad Andhra Pradesh 500 072 / IN
06 / RENU, Lohit, Vijaya
555 E.. Washington Avenue Apt. 1709
Sunnyvale CA 94086 / US
07 / VELLANKI, Vivekanand
Block 2
Apt 401
Malalysian Township
Kukatpally
Hyderabad 500 072 / IN
08 / KAVACHERI, Sathya
38503 Botany Green
Fremont CA 94536 / US
09 / HADKE, Amit, Ashoke
370 Elan Village Lane.apt. 225
San Jose CA 95134 / US
 [2013/17]
Representative(s)Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/17]Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler & Partner
P.O. Box 246
82043 Pullach / DE
Application number, filing date11796537.617.06.2011
WO2011US40936
Priority number, dateUS20100356582P19.06.2010         Original published format: US 356582 P
US20111316243916.06.2011         Original published format: US201113162439
[2013/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011160054
Date:22.12.2011
Language:EN
[2011/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2583180
Date:24.04.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2011
[2013/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.12.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F12/00
[2013/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/17]
TitleGerman:MAPREDUCE-FERTIGES SYSTEM FÜR VERTEILTE DATEIEN[2013/17]
English:MAP-REDUCE READY DISTRIBUTED FILE SYSTEM[2013/17]
French:SYSTÈME DE FICHIERS RÉPARTIS COMPATIBLE AVEC LES PROGRAMMES MAP-REDUCE[2013/17]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2012National basic fee paid 
19.12.2012Search fee paid 
19.12.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.04.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.12.2012Examination requested  [2013/17]
03.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
11.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201505   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.2015
Documents cited:Search[IY]EP1875384  (NETWORK APLLIANCE INC [US]) [I] 1,8,9,12,13 * paragraphs [0019] - [0025] * * paragraphs [0030] - [0046]; figure 4 * * paragraphs [0057] - [0064] * [Y] 2-7,10,11,14,15;
 [Y]WO2006015097  (ARCHIVAS INC [US]) [Y] 2-6 * page 13, line 19 - page 14, line 20 * * page 20, line 13 - page 22, line 10 *;
 [A]WO2008058230  (ARCHIVAS INC [US]) [A] 2-6 * page 8, line 25 - page 14, line 15 *;
 [A]EP1003103  (NETWORK APPLIANCE INC [US]) [A] 8 * paragraphs [0006] , [0 75] *;
 [Y]WO9429807  (NETWORK APPLIANCE CORP [US]) [Y] 10,11 * page 4; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2007189153  (MASON ROBERT S [US]) [A] 10,11 * paragraph [0033] *;
 [A]WO2010033150  (AVERE SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 10,11 * paragraph [0058] *;
 [Y]US7478263  (KOWNACKI RONALD WILLIAM [US], et al) [Y] 14,15 * column 11, lines 40-42 * * column 10, lines 22-36 *;
 [A]US7707165  (JIANG TIANYU [US], et al) [A] 14,15 * column 7, line 28 - column 10, line 37 *
 [Y]  - FRIEDMAN A, "Disk Emulation Using Flash Memory", NONVOLATILE MEMORY TECHNOLOGY REVIEW, 1993 LINTHICUM HEIGHTS, MD, USA 22-24 JUNE 1, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19930622), ISBN 978-0-7803-1290-6, pages 61 - 65, XP010115807 [Y] 7 * page 61, column r, paragraph 4 - page 62, column r, paragraph 3 *
 [Y]  - XIAOJIAN WU ET AL, "Managing storage space in a flash and disk hybrid storage system", MODELING, ANALYSIS&SIMULATION OF COMPUTER AND TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEMS, 2009. MASCOTS '09. IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090921), ISBN 978-1-4244-4927-9, pages 1 - 4, XP031640275 [Y] 7 * page 1, column r, paragraph last - page 2, column r, paragraph 3 *
International search[X]US2008270461  (GORDON COLIN STEBBINS [US], et al);
 [X]US2009271412  (LACAPRA FRANCESCO [US], et al);
 [A]US2009019098  (GUNDA KALYAN C [US], et al)