Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2651351

EP2651351 - A CONVEX SUPPORTING DEVICE FOR AN OSTOMY APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.07.2017
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 17.04.2019  [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Coloplast A/S
Holtedam 1
3050 Humlebæk / DK
[2013/43]
Inventor(s)01 / EKFELDT, Bent
Dannebrogsgade 14, 3. tv.
DK-1660 Koebenhavn V / DK
02 / ANDERSEN, Birthe Vestbo
Hovgaardsvej 3b
DK-3060 Espergaerde / DK
03 / STROEBECH, Esben
Selmersvej 11
DK-2970 Hoersholm / DK
04 / HANSEN, Michael
Dyreholmen 33
DK-3250 Gilleleje / DK
05 / HANSEN, Kristoffer
Dyssemarken 20
DK-2760 Maaloev / DK
06 / LARSEN, Steffen Kongensbjerg
Abel Cathrines Gade 25, 4
DK-1654 Copenhagen V / DK
07 / LAWS, Matthew
36 Shakespeare Road
Brixton London SE24 OLB / GB
08 / O'BRIEN, Liam
14 Horton Road
Hackney London E8 1DP / GB
 [2013/43]
Application number, filing date11799357.616.12.2011
WO2011DK50492
Priority number, dateDK2010007055317.12.2010         Original published format: DK 201070553
DK2010007055417.12.2010         Original published format: DK 201070554
DK2010007055517.12.2010         Original published format: DK 201070555
DK2010007055617.12.2010         Original published format: DK 201070556
DK2011007049809.09.2011         Original published format: DK 201170498
[2013/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012079592
Date:21.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2651351
Date:23.10.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2012
[2013/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2651351
Date:20.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61F5/445
[2013/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KONVEXES UNTERSTÜTZUNGSELEMENT FÜR EINE STOMAVORRICHTUNG[2014/32]
English:A CONVEX SUPPORTING DEVICE FOR AN OSTOMY APPLIANCE[2013/43]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SUPPORT CONVEXE POUR UN APPAREIL POUR STOMIE[2013/43]
Former [2013/43]KONVEXE STÜTZVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN STOMA
Entry into regional phase17.07.2013National basic fee paid 
17.07.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/43]
04.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.09.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
20.01.2015Fee for grant paid
20.01.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.02.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
13.09.2016Observations by third parties
Divisional application(s)EP15168079.0  / EP2942039
EP16205742.6  / EP3178452
EP16205744.2  / EP3175830
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.09.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.02.2016  22.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Hollister Incorporated
2000 Hollister Drive
Libertyville, Illinois 60048-3781 / US
Opponent's representative
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
 [2019/16]
Former [2016/38]
Opponent(s)01  17.02.2016  22.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Hollister Incorporated
2000 Hollister Drive
Libertyville, Illinois 60048-3781 / US
Opponent's representative
Høiberg A/S
Adelgade 12
1304 Copenhagen K / DK
Former [2016/12]
Opponent(s)01  17.02.2016   
Hollister Incorporated
2000 Hollister Drive
Libertyville, Illinois 60048-3781 / US
Opponent's representative
Elmeros, Claus
Høiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59A
1264 Copenhagen K / DK
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
31.03.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.08.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
05.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.07.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition15.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2066/17
15.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
08.04.2015Request for further processing filed
08.04.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.04.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.12.2011
AL20.05.2015
AT20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CY20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
MK20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SE20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
SM20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
MT07.10.2015
IE16.12.2015
LU16.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU16.12.2011
AT20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CY20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
MK20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SE20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
SM20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
MT07.10.2015
IE16.12.2015
LU16.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2017/39]HU16.12.2011
AT20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CY20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SE20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
SM20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
MT07.10.2015
IE16.12.2015
LU16.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/46]AT20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
IE16.12.2015
LU16.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/45]AT20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
IE16.12.2015
LU16.12.2015
Former [2016/36]AT20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
LU16.12.2015
Former [2016/34]AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
LU16.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/33]AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/24]AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/21]AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2016/10]AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2016/09]AT20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2016/07]AT20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2015/51]AT20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2015/50]ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2015/49]ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
PT21.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]EP1378219  (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [A] 1,11 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0039] *;
 [A]WO2010054662  (COLOPLAST AS [DK], et al) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2721204  (BRAUN BIOTROL B [FR]) [A] 1,11 * page 7, line 19 - page 8, line 21 *;
 [A]EP1464308  (MARLEN MFG AND DEV COMPANY [US]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE20307688U  (FOR LIFE PRODUKTIONS UND VERTR [DE]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *
by applicantEP1378219
 WO2010054662
OppositionWO2010054662
 WO03075808
    - HOLLISTER, "Making Sense of Convexity", Hollister, XP055298142