Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2647214

EP2647214 - SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING IMPROVED FACILITIES IN TIME-SHIFTED BROADCASTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  08.01.2016
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2016New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cachebox TV Limited
37 Station Road
London
NW4 4PN / GB
[2015/32]
Former [2013/41]For all designated states
Kelman, Alistair Bruce
37 Station Road
London NW4 4NJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2013/41]
Representative(s)Evens, Paul Jonathan
Maguire Boss
24 East Street
St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/41]Evens, Paul Jonathan
Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives
Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB
Application number, filing date11799457.418.11.2011
WO2011GB52259
Priority number, dateGB2010002036101.12.2010         Original published format: GB 201020361
[2013/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012072999
Date:07.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2647214
Date:09.10.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2012
[2013/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/45, H04N21/433, H04N21/458, H04N21/475, G11B27/00
[2013/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/41]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VERBESSERTER EINRICHTUNGEN BEI ZEITVERSETZTEN RUNDFUNKSENDUNGEN[2013/41]
English:SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING IMPROVED FACILITIES IN TIME-SHIFTED BROADCASTS[2013/41]
French:SYSTÈME DE FOURNITURE DE FONCTIONS AMÉLIORÉES DANS DES RADIODIFFUSIONS TEMPORELLEMENT DÉCALÉES[2013/41]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2013National basic fee paid 
13.06.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/41]
07.01.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.10.2014Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
25.11.2014Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
13.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.01.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/06]
05.01.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.01.2016
29.01.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)EP15195703.2  / EP3010243
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.02.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201505   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XI]GB2464630  (INCENTV LTD [GB]) [X] 1,8,9,11 * figures 2, 4a * * page 3, line 1 - line 7 * * page 4, line 12 - line 16 * * page 5, line 14 - line 19 * * page 8, line 6 - line 27 * * page 11, line 27 - page 12, line 25 * [I] 2-7,10;
 [XYI]US2010054707  (KARAOGUZ JEYHAN [US], et al) [X] 1,8,11 * figures 1,2,4 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0027] * [Y] 9,10 [I] 2-7;
 [IA]US2003066078  (BJORGAN STEPHEN [US], et al) [I] 1,3,4 * figures 2,3,6 * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0078] * [A] 2,5-11;
 [Y]WO2007119125  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 9,10 * figures 1,3a, 3c, 9 * * page 9, line 2 - page 10, line 25 * * page 16, line 29 - page 17, line 25 *