Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2648634

EP2648634 - REVOLVING LOCK FOR EXTERNAL FIXATION CLAMPS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer, Inc.
1800 W. Center Street
Warsaw IN 46580 / US
[2015/18]
Former [2015/14]For all designated states
Zimmer, Inc.
P.O. Box 708 345 East Main Street
Warsaw, IN 46580 / US
Former [2013/42]For all designated states
ExtraOrtho, Inc.
8275 Tournament Drive, Suite 160
Memphis, TN 38125 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MULLANEY, Michael W.
5 Hilltop Road
Kinnelon, New Jersey 07405 / US
 [2013/42]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2016/20]
Former [2013/42]Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date11799923.508.12.2011
[2016/20]
WO2011US63985
Priority number, dateUS20100421502P09.12.2010         Original published format: US 421502 P
[2013/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012078897
Date:14.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2648634
Date:16.10.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2012
[2013/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2648634
Date:18.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/64
[2013/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DREHENDES SCHLOSS FÜR EXTERNE FIXIERKLAMMERN[2013/42]
English:REVOLVING LOCK FOR EXTERNAL FIXATION CLAMPS[2013/42]
French:VERROU ROTATIF POUR CLAMPS DE FIXATION EXTERNE[2013/42]
Entry into regional phase09.07.2013National basic fee paid 
09.07.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/42]
17.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.04.2016Fee for grant paid
05.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.11.2015
Opposition(s)21.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.12.2011
AL18.05.2016
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
TR18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
LU08.12.2016
MT08.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU08.12.2011
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
TR18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
LU08.12.2016
MT08.12.2016
Former [2018/43]HU08.12.2011
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
LU08.12.2016
MT08.12.2016
Former [2018/38]HU08.12.2011
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
LU08.12.2016
Former [2018/31]HU08.12.2011
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
LU08.12.2016
Former [2018/28]HU08.12.2011
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
LU08.12.2016
Former [2017/49]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
LU08.12.2016
Former [2017/37]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/04]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]US2006178566  (FETZER PETER E [DE] FETZER PETER EDWARD [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-9,13,15-23 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2006271045  (HUBBARD DENNIS [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4,7-9,13-18,20-23 * figure 2 *;
 [X]US2003120132  (PHILLIPS BURNS [US]) [X] 1-4,8,9,13,15-18,20-23 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2008177315  (USHER JOHN A [US]) [X] 1,3,4,8,9,13,16-19,21-23 * figure 3 *;
 [X]US2007055110  (BASS DANIEL [US]) [X] 1,3,4,7,13,16-19,21-23 * figures 2A-4B,6A,6B *;
 [X]WO2009004347  (FIXATOR INNOVATIONS LTD [GB]; ELLOY MARTIN ARTHUR [GB]; RAFFAN PETER [) [X] 1,3,4,13,14,16-18,21-25 * figures 2a-3b *