Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2588886

EP2588886 - METHOD FOR COMBINED ACTIVE SOURCE AND PASSIVE SEISMIC IMAGING FOR SUBSURFACE FLUID MOVEMENT MAPPING AND FORMATION CHARACTERIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.02.2019
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.03.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Acoustic Zoom, Inc.
685 St. Thomas Line
Paradise
Newfoundland and Labrador A1L 3V2 / CA
[2013/36]
Former [2013/19]For all designated states
Pangeo Subsea, Inc.
277 Water Street
St. John's, Newfoundland & Labrador A1C 6L3 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / GUIGNÉ, Jacques, Y.
685 St. Thomas Line
Paradise Newfoundland and Labrador A1L 3V2 / CA
02 / PACE, Nicholas, G.
26 Forester Road
Bath Somerset BA2 6QE / GB
03 / GOGACZ, Adam
6 Rich's Place
Pouch Cove Newfoundland and Labrador A0A 3L0 / CA
[2019/14]
Former [2013/19]01 / GUIGNÉ, Jacques, Y.
685 St. Thomas Line
Paradise Newfoundland&Labrador A1L 3V2 / CA
02 / PACE, Nicholas, G.
26 Forester Road
Bath Somerset BA2 6QE / GB
03 / GOGACZ, Adam
6 Rich's Place
Pouch Cove Newfoundland&Labrador A0A 3L0 / CA
Representative(s)Intès, Didier Gérard André , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158 rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/19]Intès, Didier Gérard André , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date11800007.423.06.2011
WO2011CA00738
Priority number, dateUS2010082607829.06.2010         Original published format: US 826078
[2013/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012000083
Date:05.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2588886
Date:08.05.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2012
[2013/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA05.01.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01V1/28, G01V1/40, G01V1/48
[2017/20]
Former International [2013/19]G01V1/00, G01V1/04, G01V1/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/19]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR KOMBINIERTEN AKTIVEN QUELLEN- UND PASSIVEN SEISMISCHEN BILDGEBUNG ZUR DARSTELLUNG DER BEWEGUNG UNTERIRDISCHER FLÜSSIGKEITEN UND ZUR FORMATIONSCHARAKTERISIERUNG[2013/19]
English:METHOD FOR COMBINED ACTIVE SOURCE AND PASSIVE SEISMIC IMAGING FOR SUBSURFACE FLUID MOVEMENT MAPPING AND FORMATION CHARACTERIZATION[2013/19]
French:PROCÉDÉ COMBINANT UNE SOURCE ACTIVE ET UNE IMAGERIE SISMIQUE PASSIVE POUR CARTOGRAPHIER UN MOUVEMENT DE FLUIDE SOUTERRAIN ET CARACTÉRISER UNE FORMATION[2013/19]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2013National basic fee paid 
08.01.2013Search fee paid 
08.01.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/19]
24.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.03.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
26.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
28.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2009122645  (GUIGNE JACQUES Y [CA], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0024] , [0044] , [0053] , [0058] , [0059] *;
 [Y]WO2008033797  (MICROSEISMIC INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0023] *
International search[A]US2009122645  (GUIGNE JACQUES Y [CA], et al);
 [AP]US2011044131  (THORNTON MICHAEL P [US], et al);
 [A]US7383133  (SCOTT GARY LEE [US]);
 [A]US2005190649  (EISNER LEO [GB], et al)