Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2788704

EP2788704 - HEAT EXCHANGER FOR COOLING A HEATING TUBE AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 06.03.2019  [2019/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Applied Materials, Inc.
3050 Bowers Avenue
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / HOFFMANN, Gerd
Langstr. 13
63486 Bruchkoebel / DE
02 / SKUK, Peter
Römerstr. 3
61130 Nidderau / DE
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
[2019/10]
Former [2014/42]Zimmermann & Partner
Josephspitalstr. 15
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date11801675.709.12.2011
[2019/10]
WO2011EP72371
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013083204
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2788704
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2788704
Date:06.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:F28D5/00, F28D7/00
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:WÄRMETAUSCHER ZUM KÜHLEN EINES HEIZROHRES UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR[2014/42]
English:HEAT EXCHANGER FOR COOLING A HEATING TUBE AND METHOD THEREOF[2014/42]
French:ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR DESTINÉ AU REFROIDISSEMENT D'UN TUYAU DE CHAUFFAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2014National basic fee paid 
13.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
29.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
24.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.01.2019Fee for grant paid
22.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.06.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[IY]EP1681715  (OHMI TADAHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1,7,8,10-13 * paragraphs [0029] - [0053] - [0073] - [0077] - [0090] - [0108]; figure - * [Y] 2-6,9,14,15;
 [I]WO2008126595  (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1,7,8,10-13 * abstract *;
 [I]US2007163502  (NOZAWA TOSHIHISA [JP], et al) [I] 1-3,8,10-13 * paragraphs [0006] - [0025] - [0044] - [0052] - [0059] - [0062] - [0070] - [0071]; figure - *;
 [Y]US6247525  (SMITH MARC K [US], et al) [Y] 5,6,14,15 * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 55 * * column 8, line 16 - column 10, line 8 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [Y]US2011059260  (STIRNIMAN MICHAEL J [US]) [Y] 2-4 * paragraphs [0034] - [0035]; figure - *;
 [Y]CN102139254  (CN ACAD AGRI SCI FARML IRRIGAT) [Y] 2-4 * abstract *;
 [Y]US2004013800  (STRAUCH GERHARD KARL [DE], et al) [Y] 4,14,15 * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] - [0029]; figure - *;
 [Y]WO9837976  (RIMROCK CORP [US]) [Y] 4,14,15 * page 8, line 11 - page 10, line last; figure -; claim - *;
 [Y]US3799257  (DE CLERCQ W) [Y] 9 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS2006204648
 US2009320500
 US2005183844
 KR20110127285