Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795616

EP2795616 - SPEECH RECOGNITION METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.01.2017  [2017/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Squarehead Technology AS
P.O. Box 13
0410 Oslo / NO
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / KJØLERBAKKEN, Morgan
Carl Jeppesens gate 24
N-0481 Oslo / NO
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Onsagers AS
P.O. Box 1813 Vika
0123 Oslo / NO
[2014/44]
Application number, filing date11802081.720.12.2011
WO2011EP73364
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013091677
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795616
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G10L15/25, G10L15/02
[2016/11]
Former International [2014/44]G10L15/24, G06K9/00, G06K9/62, G01H3/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:SPRACHERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM[2014/44]
English:SPEECH RECOGNITION METHOD AND SYSTEM[2014/44]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE RECONNAISSANCE VOCALE[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase05.06.2014National basic fee paid 
05.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
22.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/02]
25.08.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2017/02]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.03.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]US2010272286  (BAI MINGSIAN R [TW] ET AL) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - JENNINGS D L ET AL, "Enhancing automatic speech recognition with an ultrasonic lip motion detector", 1995 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING - 9-12 MAY 1995 - DETROIT, MI, USA, IEEE - NEW YORK, NY, USA, (19950509), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/ICASSP.1995.479832, ISBN 978-0-7803-2431-2, pages 868 - 871, XP010625371 [A] 1-21 * p. 868, section 2. "Background" * * p. 869, section 3. "Experimental Methods" * * figures 1-2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1995.479832
 [A]  - HUGHES T B ET AL, "Using a real-time, tracking microphone array as input to an HMM speech recognizer", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1998. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1998 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SEATTLE, WA, USA 12-15 MAY 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980512), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/ICASSP.1998.674414, ISBN 978-0-7803-4428-0, pages 249 - 252, XP010279155 [A] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1998.674414
 [A]  - BREGLER C ET AL, "A hybrid approach to bimodal speech recognition", SIGNALS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS, 1994. 1994 CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE TW ENTY-EIGHTH ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON PACIFIC GROVE, CA, USA 31 OCT.-2 NOV. 1994, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19941031), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/ACSSC.1994.471514, ISBN 978-0-8186-6405-2, pages 556 - 560, XP010148562 [A] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.1994.471514
by applicantUS2011040155
    - H. KRIM; M. VIBERG, "Two Decades of Array Signal Processing Research - The Parametric Approach", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING MAGAZINE, (199607), doi:doi:10.1109/79.526899, pages 67 - 94, XP002176649

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/79.526899