Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2643442

EP2643442 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR PURIFYING MATERIAL OF BIOLOGICAL ORIGIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.04.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UPM-Kymmene Corporation
Alvar Aallon katu 1
00100 Helsinki / FI
[2015/30]
Former [2013/40]For all designated states
UPM-Kymmene Corporation
Eteläesplanadi 2
00130 Helsinki / FI
Inventor(s)01 / NOUSIAINEN, Jaakko
Variksenmarjankatu 7
FI-53500 Lappeenranta / FI
02 / LAUMOLA, Heli
Pikkukoskentie 7 C
FI-00650 Helsinki / FI
03 / RISSANEN, Arto
Ortamonraitti 4 A 8
FI-53300 Lappeenranta / FI
04 / KOTONEVA, Jari
Kalervonkatu 77
FI-53100 Lappeenranta / FI
05 / RISTOLAINEN, Matti
Upseeritie 14 B 9
FI-53900 Lappeenranta / FI
 [2013/40]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/08]Boco IP Oy Ab
Itämerenkatu 5
00180 Helsinki / FI
Former [2013/40]Hakkila, Maini Annika , et al
Boco IP Oy Ab
Itämerenkatu 5
00180 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date11802115.325.11.2011
WO2011FI51037
Priority number, dateFI2010000625226.11.2010         Original published format: FI 20106252
FI2011000521703.03.2011         Original published format: FI 20115217
FI2011000572306.07.2011         Original published format: FI 20115723
[2013/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012069704
Date:31.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2643442
Date:02.10.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2012
[2013/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2643442
Date:20.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:C11B13/00, B01D3/14, C10L1/18, C10G3/00
[2014/52]
Former International [2013/40]C11B13/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REINIGUNG VON MATERIAL BIOLOGISCHEN URSPRUNGS[2013/40]
English:PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR PURIFYING MATERIAL OF BIOLOGICAL ORIGIN[2013/40]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE PURIFICATION D'UNE SUBSTANCE D'ORIGINE BIOLOGIQUE[2013/40]
Entry into regional phase25.06.2013National basic fee paid 
25.06.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/40]
04.09.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2015Fee for grant paid
10.04.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.04.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP15168211.9  / EP2930231
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.09.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.02.2016  18.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sunpine AB
P.O. Box 76
941 22 Pitea / SE
Opponent's representative
AWA Sweden AB, et al
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
 02  18.02.2016   
Neste Oyj
P.O. Box 95
Keilaranta
00095 Neste / FI
Opponent's representative
TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/13]
Opponent(s)01  15.02.2016  18.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sunpine AB
P.O. Box 76
941 22 Pitea / SE
Opponent's representative
Awapatent AB, et al
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
 02  18.02.2016   
Neste Oyj
P.O. Box 95
Keilaranta
00095 Neste / FI
Opponent's representative
TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2016/12]
Opponent(s)01  15.02.2016  18.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sunpine AB
P.O. Box 76
941 22 Pitea / SE
Opponent's representative
Awapatent AB, et al
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
01.04.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.07.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
25.09.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.09.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition30.11.2017Appeal received No.  T2515/17
05.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
20.11.2017Appeal received No.  T2515/17
31.01.2018Statement of grounds filed
23.11.2017Appeal received No.  T2515/17
24.01.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.11.2011
AL20.05.2015
AT20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CY20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
MK20.05.2015
MT20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
SM20.05.2015
TR20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
IE25.11.2015
LU25.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU25.11.2011
AT20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CY20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
MK20.05.2015
MT20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
SM20.05.2015
TR20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
IE25.11.2015
LU25.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2017/39]HU25.11.2011
AT20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CY20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
MT20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
SM20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
IE25.11.2015
LU25.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/45]AT20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
IE25.11.2015
LU25.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/37]AT20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
LU25.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/34]AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
LU25.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/31]AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
LU25.11.2015
Former [2016/28]AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2016/24]AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2016/10]AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2016/09]AT20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2016/07]AT20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2015/51]AT20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2015/50]FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2015/49]FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
GR21.08.2015
PT21.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2009131510  (SUNPINE AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,19,27 * claims 1,8 * [I] 2-18,20-26,28-30;
 [XI]EP1586624  (HAERTING GLADE THOMAS FRANCIS [CL]) [X] 1,19,27 * paragraph [0035]; figure 1; claim 1 * [I] 2-18,20-26,28-30;
 [XI]US2716630  (ALBRECHT SPANGENBERG WILLY JOH, et al) [X] 1,19,27 * claim 1 * [I] 2-18,20-26,28-30;
 [XI]US2886492  (HANSON ELWOOD W, et al) [X] 1,19,27 * sentence 15 - sentence 43; figures 1-4 * [I] 2-18,20-26,28-30
by applicantUS5705722
OppositionEP1291355
 EP1637582
 US2894880
 US3644179
 US2005051419
 WO03038020
 WO2007050030
 WO2008017730
 WO2009011639
 WO2009131510
 WO2010097519
 US2009163744
 US2010038284
 EP1741768
 US5705722
 DE2736357
 WO2009125072
 US3644719
    - "Tall Oil", NORLIN, L.-H. et al., Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, (20050000), pages 1 - 14, XP002519551

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/14356007.A26.057
    - Derk T. A. Huibers, "Tall Oil", Kirk-Othmer Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, (20001204), pages 1 - 7, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/10.1002/0471238961.2001121208210902.a01/abstract, XP055302512

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/0471238961.2001121208210902.a01
    - Marker,T.L., "Opportunities for Biorenewables in Oil Refineries", STI Final Report, (20051212), XP055303180
    - HARVEY, B. H et al., "High-density renewable fuels based on the selective dimerization of pinenes", Energy Fuels, (20091113), vol. 24, pages 267 - 273, XP055302519

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ef900799c
    - "Pages 3pp, 28-37, 176-183, 224-235, 354-363", Duane F. ZINKEL, James Russell, Naval Stores Production-Chemistry-Utilzation, Pulp Cehemicals association, Inc., (19890000), pages 177 - 183, XP055303040