Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2676315

EP2676315 - POLYMER-IONOPHORE SEPARATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2013/52]
Inventor(s)01 / HASENKOX, Ulrich
Kurt-Tucholsky-Str. 4
71254 Ditzingen / DE
 [2013/52]
Application number, filing date11802896.816.12.2011
[2019/33]
WO2011EP73009
Priority number, dateDE2011100409415.02.2011         Original published format: DE102011004094
[2013/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012110140
Date:23.08.2012
Language:DE
[2012/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2676315
Date:25.12.2013
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2012
[2013/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2676315
Date:14.08.2019
Language:DE
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.08.2012
ClassificationInternational:H01M4/38, H01M4/134, H01M10/0565, H01M10/052, H01M10/0567, H01M10/0569, H01M4/136, H01M2/16
[2019/09]
Former International [2013/52]H01M4/38, H01M4/134, H01M10/0565, H01M10/052, H01M10/0567, H01M10/0569, H01M4/136
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLYMER-IONOPHOR-SEPARATOR[2013/52]
English:POLYMER-IONOPHORE SEPARATOR[2013/52]
French:SÉPARATEUR POLYMÈRE-IONOPHORE[2013/52]
Entry into regional phase16.09.2013National basic fee paid 
16.09.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.09.2013Examination requested  [2013/52]
27.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2019Fee for grant paid
21.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.03.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
01.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201808   M06   Fee paid on   01.07.2019
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2005175903  (KIM JU-YUP [KR] ET AL) [X] 1-4,6-10,12,13 * paragraphs [0020] - [0024] - [0036] - [0065] * [Y] 1-13 [I] 5;
 [Y]EP0854527  (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * page 2, lines 27-53 * * page 3, line 9 - page 8, line 7 *;
 [Y]US2005074675  (NISHIJIMA MOTOAKI [JP] ET AL) [Y] 11 * paragraphs [0022] - [0028] - [0043] *;
 [A]  - HENG L Y ET AL, "One-step synthesis of K+ -selective methacrylic-acrylic copolymers containing grafted ionophore and requiring no plasticier", ELECTROANALYSIS, VHC PUBLISHERS, INC, US, (20000101), vol. 12, no. 3, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1521-4109(200002)12:3<178::AID-ELAN178>3.0.CO;2-Z, ISSN 1040-0397, pages 178 - 186, XP008087020 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-4109(200002)12:3<178::AID-ELAN178>3.0.CO;2-Z
ExaminationJP2002237285
    - KAPLAN M L ET AL, "Crown ether enhancement of ionic conductivity in a polymer-salt system", SOLID STATE IONICS, NORTH HOLLAND PUB. COMPANY. AMSTERDAM; NL, NL, vol. 25, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0167-2738(87)90175-5, ISSN 0167-2738, (19871001), pages 37 - 40, (19871001), XP024643534

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-2738(87)90175-5
    - ANDREI M ET AL, "Polymer electrolytes based on poly-phosphazene with pendant 12-crown-4 groups and monovalent salts", ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, vol. 37, no. 9, doi:10.1016/0013-4686(92)80108-X, ISSN 0013-4686, (19920101), pages 1545 - 1549, (19920101), XP026516879

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0013-4686(92)80108-X
    - DARMASENA PARAMUNAGE ET AL, "Poly(crown ether): A potential candidate for Solid-State Electrolytes", MACROMOLECULES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19890101), vol. 22, doi:10.1021/MA00196A053, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 2845 - 2849, XP002086268

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma00196a053
by applicant   - W. SIMON, HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (1975), vol. 58, pages 1535 - 1548