Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798763

EP2798763 - SYMBOL DETECTION TECHNIQUE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.01.2019
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / EDER, Franz
Siegfriedstr. 41
90559 Burgthann / DE
02 / MUELLER-WEINFURTNER, Stefan
Goethestrasse 15
90409 Nürnberg / DE
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Neuerburg, Gerhard , et al
Ericsson GmbH Patent Department Ericsson Allee 1
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
Application number, filing date11804501.228.12.2011
WO2011EP06589
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013097875
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798763
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/18
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON SYMBOLEN[2014/45]
English:SYMBOL DETECTION TECHNIQUE[2014/45]
French:TECHNIQUE DE DÉTECTION DE SYMBOLE[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase28.07.2014National basic fee paid 
28.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.04.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
29.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.01.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP2378696  (DESIGNART NETWORKS LTD [IL]) [X] 1-6,9-15,18,19,22,23,25-30 * abstract * * figures 2a,2b,3 * * paragraphs [0020] - [0026] * * claims 1-5 * [I] 7,8,16,17,20,21,24