Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2798763


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.05.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
31.01.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.01.2019 First examination report
11.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.12.2017 Change - representative
06.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.08.2016 Change - representative
08.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  08.04.2015  [2015/15]
10.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
03.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
04.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
13.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
30.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
29.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
04.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
11.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
05.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
14.01.2012 PCT data prior to European publication