Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793825

EP2793825 - SYSTEM PROVIDING ENZYME-CATALYZED REACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022 / US
[2016/46]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BOYD, Thomas
226 High Street
Metuchen, New Jersey 08840 / US
02 / XU, Guofeng
40 Silvers Lane
Plainsboro, New Jersey 08536 / US
03 / ADAMS, Richard
111 Kingsland Circle
Monmouth Junction, New Jersey 08852 / US
04 / PIERCE, Robert
10 Runyon Drive
Basking Ridge New Jersey 07920 / US
05 / SAMAROO, Derek
1254 Inman Avenue
Edison, New Jersey 08820 / US
06 / VISCIO, David
7937 East Rusty Spur Trail
Prescott Valley, Arizona 86315 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Wibbelmann, Jobst , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
Application number, filing date11804898.219.12.2011
[2016/46]
WO2011US65827
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013095331
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793825
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2793825
Date:16.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/38, A61Q11/00, A61K8/37, A61K8/42, A61K8/66, A61K8/35
[2016/20]
Former International [2014/44]A61K8/38, A61K8/64, A61Q11/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON ENZYM-KATALYSIERTER REAKTION[2014/44]
English:SYSTEM PROVIDING ENZYME-CATALYZED REACTION[2014/44]
French:SYSTÈME PROCURANT UNE RÉACTION CATALYSÉE PAR ENZYME[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2014National basic fee paid 
17.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
17.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
24.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.10.2016Fee for grant paid
03.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16192093.9  / EP3130327
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.06.2015
Opposition(s)17.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
05.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.12.2011
AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CY16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
IS16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
MK16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
TR16.11.2016
IE19.12.2016
LU19.12.2016
MT19.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
[2018/45]
Former [2018/43]HU19.12.2011
AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CY16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
IS16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
MK16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
IE19.12.2016
LU19.12.2016
MT19.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2018/30]HU19.12.2011
AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CY16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
IS16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
MK16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
IE19.12.2016
LU19.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/49]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
IE19.12.2016
LU19.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/42]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/38]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/37]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/36]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/33]AT16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
BE31.12.2016
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/26]AT16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
BE31.12.2016
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV16.11.2016
Cited inInternational search[XD]US5302375  (VISCIO DAVID [US]) [XD] 18,24-28 * claims 1-2, 5, 11 *;
 [XD]WO2007103050  (GENENCOR INT [US], et al) [XD] 18,19,24-28 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 12] , [0 14] * * paragraphs [0069] - [0074] *;
 [I]WO2007041408  (ALCON INC [US], et al) [I] 1-28 * claims 1-2, 5, 8 * * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 3 *;
 [E]WO2012087970  (DU PONT [US], et al) [E] 1-28 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5302375
 US5279816
 US6221341
 US7189385
 US2009311198
 US7510859
 US2008176783
 US2008176299
 US2009005590
 US2010041752
 US2010087529
 US7862801
 US5746598
 US6730316
 US7128899