Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2793825 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2793825



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 243
20.09.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
03.04.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.11.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
20.10.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.10.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.10.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
03.10.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
03.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
01.06.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
01.06.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
01.06.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
01.06.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
01.06.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 18
17.05.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
24.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
24.03.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 14
24.03.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
24.03.2016 Description Search / examination 13
24.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.03.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.02.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
01.02.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
19.10.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
19.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.10.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
19.06.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
19.06.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.06.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
17.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.02.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
17.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
17.02.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
17.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.09.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
18.08.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
13.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
25.06.2014 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 17
06.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
28.03.2014 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 9
28.03.2014 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
28.03.2014 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
28.03.2014 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
28.03.2014 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.12.2013 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.12.2013 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
12.12.2013 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
27.11.2013 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
27.11.2013 Notification of the recording of a change PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.10.2013 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.10.2013 Cover sheet for fax transmission PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.10.2013 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.10.2013 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
14.10.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
14.10.2013 Payment of fees and costs PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
27.06.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 21
21.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
21.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
21.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4