Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2793825


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
13.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
22.09.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
04.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
14.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.08.2017  [2017/33]
07.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
30.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
16.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.07.2017  [2017/29]
26.05.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.06.2017  [2017/26]
29.03.2017 Change - representative
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
14.10.2016 (Expected) grant published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
07.10.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
07.10.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
07.10.2016 Change - divisional application(s) published on  09.11.2016  [2016/45]
04.10.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
31.05.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.04.2016 Change - classification published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
15.04.2016 Change - classification published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
30.03.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.02.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.10.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
30.06.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
19.06.2015 First examination report
20.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  25.03.2015  [2015/13]
19.02.2015 Amendment by applicant
10.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
26.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
29.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
08.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
01.11.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
05.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
17.01.2012 PCT data prior to European publication