Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2666311

EP2666311 - UNIVERSAL BROADBAND BROADCASTING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2015
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG
Mühldorfstrasse 15
81671 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/48]For all designated states
Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG
Mühldorfstrasse 15
81671 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SIMON, Michael
6471 Forest Hills Court
Frederick Maryland 21701 / US
 [2013/48]
Representative(s)Körfer, Thomas
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
[2015/08]
Former [2013/48]Körfer, Thomas
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date11804989.913.12.2011
WO2011EP72570
Priority number, dateUS201161434466P20.01.2011         Original published format: US 201161434466 P
US20111331341707.12.2011         Original published format: US201113313417
[2013/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012097923
Date:26.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2666311
Date:27.11.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2012
[2013/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2666311
Date:18.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/06
[2013/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:UNIVERSELLER BREITBANDRUNDFUNK[2013/48]
English:UNIVERSAL BROADBAND BROADCASTING[2013/48]
French:RADIODIFFUSION LARGE BANDE UNIVERSELLE[2013/48]
Entry into regional phase29.05.2013National basic fee paid 
29.05.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
29.05.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.04.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/48]
04.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.09.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.12.2014Fee for grant paid
29.12.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.12.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.09.2014
Opposition(s)19.11.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2016/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.12.2011
AL18.02.2015
AT18.02.2015
BE18.02.2015
BG18.02.2015
CY18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
DK18.02.2015
EE18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
IT18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
MK18.02.2015
MT18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
PL18.02.2015
PT18.02.2015
RO18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SE18.02.2015
SI18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
TR18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU13.12.2011
AT18.02.2015
BE18.02.2015
BG18.02.2015
CY18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
DK18.02.2015
EE18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
IT18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
MK18.02.2015
MT18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
PL18.02.2015
PT18.02.2015
RO18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SE18.02.2015
SI18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
TR18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
Former [2018/31]HU13.12.2011
AT18.02.2015
BE18.02.2015
BG18.02.2015
CY18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
DK18.02.2015
EE18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
IT18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
MK18.02.2015
MT18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
PL18.02.2015
PT18.02.2015
RO18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SE18.02.2015
SI18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
Former [2017/39]HU13.12.2011
AT18.02.2015
BE18.02.2015
BG18.02.2015
CY18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
DK18.02.2015
EE18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
IT18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
MT18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
PL18.02.2015
RO18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SE18.02.2015
SI18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
Former [2016/33]AT18.02.2015
BE18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
DK18.02.2015
EE18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
IT18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
PL18.02.2015
RO18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SE18.02.2015
SI18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
Former [2016/24]AT18.02.2015
BE18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
DK18.02.2015
EE18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
IT18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
PL18.02.2015
RO18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SE18.02.2015
SI18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
Former [2016/12]AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
DK18.02.2015
EE18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
IT18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
PL18.02.2015
RO18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SE18.02.2015
SI18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
Former [2016/03]AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
DK18.02.2015
EE18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
IT18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
PL18.02.2015
RO18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SE18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
Former [2015/50]AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
DK18.02.2015
EE18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
PL18.02.2015
RO18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SE18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
Former [2015/49]AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
DK18.02.2015
EE18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
RO18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SE18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
Former [2015/39]AT18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
LV18.02.2015
NL18.02.2015
RS18.02.2015
SE18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
Former [2015/38]AT18.02.2015
ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
SE18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
IS18.06.2015
Former [2015/37]ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
SE18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
GR19.05.2015
Former [2015/36]ES18.02.2015
FI18.02.2015
HR18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
SE18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
Former [2015/35]ES18.02.2015
LT18.02.2015
NO18.05.2015
Former [2015/33]ES18.02.2015
Cited inInternational search[X]US2006126556  (JIANG HONG [US] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0145] - paragraph [0147] *;
 [A]US2008259835  (VENKATACHALAM MUTHAIAH [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0041]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2008056219  (VENKATACHALAM MUTHAIAH [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0028]; figure 1 *
 [A]  - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Introduction of the Multimedia Broadcast/Multicast Service (MBMS) in the Radio Access Network (RAN); Stage 2 (3GPP TS 25.346 version 7.4.0 Release 7); ETSI TS 125 346", IEEE, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20070601), vol. 3-R2, no. V7.4.0, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014040025 [A] 1-15 * page 28, paragraph 7.1A - page 29 *