Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101882295B | Global Dossier | 24.08.2018 | B1 | KR20140010045 | 23.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP72570 | 13.12.2011 | US201161434466 | 20.01.2011 | US201113313417 | 07.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2666311 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2015 | B1 | EP2666311 | 27.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP72570 | 13.12.2011 | US201161434466 | 20.01.2011 | US201113313417 | 07.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2013007875 | 29.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP72570 | 13.12.2011 | US201161434466 | 20.01.2011 | US201113313417 | 07.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012097923 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161434466 | 20.01.2011 | US201113313417 | 07.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8989021 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2015 | B2 | US2012188878 | 26.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161434466 | 20.01.2011 | US201113313417 | 07.12.2011 |