Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2788345

EP2788345 - DERIVATIVES OF 4-HYDROXY-1,2,3,4-TETRAHYDRONAPHTALEN-1-YL UREA AND THEIR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF, INTER ALIA, DISEASES OF THE RESPIRATORY TRACT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.11.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chiesi Farmaceutici S.p.A.
Via Palermo, 26/A
43100 Parma / IT
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / FINCH, Harry
c/o CHIESI FARMACEUTICI S.p.A.
Via Palermo 26/A
I-43100 Parma / IT
02 / VAN NIEL, Monique Bodil
c/o CHIESI FARMACEUTICI S.p.A.
Via Palermo 26/A
I-43100 Parma / IT
03 / WOO, Chi-Kit
c/o CHIESI FARMACEUTICI S.p.A.
Via Palermo 26/A
I-43100 Parma / IT
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Minoja, Fabrizio
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l.
Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Minoja, Fabrizio
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date11805445.109.12.2011
WO2011EP72375
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013083206
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2788345
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07D403/12, C07D471/04, A61K31/455, A61K31/4196, A61P11/06
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBA03.06.2014
ME03.06.2014
TitleGerman:ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON, UNTER ANDEREM, ATEMWEGSERKRANKUNGEN GEEIGNETE DERIVATE VON 4-HYDROXY-1,2,3,4-TETRAHYDRONAPHTALEN-1-YLHARNSTOFF[2019/44]
English:DERIVATIVES OF 4-HYDROXY-1,2,3,4-TETRAHYDRONAPHTALEN-1-YL UREA AND THEIR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF, INTER ALIA, DISEASES OF THE RESPIRATORY TRACT[2014/42]
French:DERIVES DE 4-HYDROXY-1,2,3,4-TETRAHYDRONAPHTALEN-1-YL UREE ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE, ENTRE OUTRE, MALADIES DES VOIES RESPIRATOIRES[2019/44]
Former [2014/42]DERIVATE VON 4-HYDROXY-1,2,3,4-TETRAHYDRONAPHTALEN-1-YL HARNSTOFF UND IHRE VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON, UNTER ANDEREM, ATEMWEGSERKRANKUNGEN
Former [2014/42]DÉRIVÉS DE 4-HYDROXY-1,2,3,4-TÉTRAHYDRONAPHTALÈNE-1-YL-URÉE ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT, ENTRE AUTRES, DE MALADIES DES VOIES RESPIRATOIRES
Entry into regional phase03.06.2014National basic fee paid 
03.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
19.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
09.07.201403   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.2014
Cited inInternational search[ED]WO2011154738  (CHIESI FARMA SPA [IT], et al) [ED] 1-12 * pages 1-25 * * examples 1-11, 16, 17, 20-22 * * claims 1, 2, 4-15 *;
 [AD]WO2007091152  (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-12 * page 1, line 4 - line 13 * * page 3; compound (Ia) * * page 4; compound (Ib) * * page 26, line 6 - line 21 * * example - *;
 [A]WO02092576  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 1, line 9 - line 13 * * page 11 - page 25; compound - * * page 28, lines 8, 9, 26 * * example - *
by applicantWO2007091152
 WO2004072072
 WO2006018727
 EP0505321
 WO9703094
 WO9702289
 WO2005026124
 WO03053930
 WO2006082412
 WO0242298
 EP1052264
 EP1241176
 WO2008043019
 WO2010022076
 WO2008016192
 WO2007072158
 WO2010094956
 WO9628448
 US2006035922
 WO2009098612
 WO2005023761
    - STEIN ET AL., ANN. REP. MED CHEM., (1996), vol. 31, pages 289 - 298
    - HERLAAR E.; BROWN Z., MOLECULAR MEDICINE TODAY, (1999), vol. 5, pages 439 - 447
    - DINARELLO ET AL., REV. INFECT. DISEASE, (1984), vol. 6, page 51
    - BADGER ET AL., J. PHARM. EXP. THERA., (1996), vol. 279, pages 1453 - 1461
    - GRISWOLD ET AL., PHARMACOL. COMM., (1996), vol. 7, pages 323 - 229
    - HADDAD, BR. J. PHARMACOL., (2001), vol. 132, no. 8, pages 1715 - 1724
    - UNDERWOOD ET AL., AM. J. PHYSIOL. LUNG CELL. MOL., (2000), vol. 279, pages 895 - 902
    - DUAN ET AL., AM. J. RESPIR. CRIT. CARE MED., (2005), vol. 171, pages 571 - 578
    - ESCOTT ET AL., BR. J. PHARMACOL., (2000), vol. 131, pages 173 - 176
    - UNDERWOOD ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (2000), vol. 293, pages 281 - 288
    - LEE ET AL., IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, (2000), vol. 47, pages 185 - 200
    - P. CHOPRA ET AL., EXPERT OPINION ON INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, (2008), vol. 17, no. 10, pages 1411 - 1425
    - G. J. HANSON, EXPERT OPINIONS ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS, (1997), vol. 7, pages 729 - 733
    - J HYNES ET AL., CURRENT TOPICS IN MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2005), vol. 5, pages 967 - 985
    - C. DOMINGUEZ ET AL., EXPERT OPINIONS ON THERAPEUTICS PATENTS, (2005), vol. 15, pages 801 - 816
    - L. H. PETTUS; R. P. WURTZ, CURRENT TOPICS IN MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2008), vol. 8, pages 1452 - 1467
    - T. HIGUCHI; V.J. STELLA, Pro-drugs as Novel Delivery Systems, ACS SYMPOSIUM SERIES, vol. 14
    - SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, (2009), vol. 39, no. 22, pages 3999 - 4009
    - CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2002), vol. 3, pages 266 - 267
 WO2011GB51076