Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2788345 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2788345



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 830
11.11.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
11.11.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
11.11.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
11.11.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 88
11.11.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 88
04.11.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
04.11.2019 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
04.11.2019 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
31.10.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
05.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.06.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 81
05.06.2019 Description Search / examination 80
05.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.06.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.03.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
04.03.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
23.01.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
23.01.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 85
23.01.2018 Claims Search / examination 8
23.01.2018 Description Search / examination 81
23.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.01.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.10.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
30.10.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.10.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.06.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
19.06.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 10
29.05.2017 Claims Search / examination 8
29.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.05.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.03.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
01.03.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.02.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
19.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.01.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 10
19.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 10
19.01.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
19.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.09.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.09.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
13.08.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
14.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.06.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
03.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
22.04.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
13.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
13.06.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 96
04.09.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
04.09.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
04.09.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
09.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
09.12.2011 Abstract PCT receiving Office 4
09.12.2011 Claims PCT receiving Office 10
09.12.2011 Description PCT receiving Office 85