Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2788345


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.11.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.09.2019 Change - German title published on  30.10.2019  [2019/44]
27.09.2019 Change - French title published on  30.10.2019  [2019/44]
05.06.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
27.02.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.01.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.11.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.10.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
29.06.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.06.2017 Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.05.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
11.03.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.03.2017 First examination report
06.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.01.2015 Amendment by applicant
10.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
12.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
28.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
28.08.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
07.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
07.06.2014 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
04.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
24.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
14.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
31.08.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
19.01.2012 PCT data prior to European publication