Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2651982

EP2651982 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR RECOVERING HYDROCARBONS FROM A POLYOLEFIN PURGE GAS PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.10.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Univation Technologies, LLC
5555 San Felipe Suite 1950
Houston, TX 77056 / US
[2013/43]
Inventor(s)01 / BLOOD, Mark, W.
122 Willard Circle
Hurricane, WV 25526 / US
02 / FORCE, Randall, L.
11 Pinnacle Dr.
Charleston, WV 25311 / US
03 / DUNCAN, Theodore, D.
200 Dogwood Drive
Elkview, WV 25071 / US
04 / SCHWARZ, JR., George, W.
729 Churchill Drive
Charleston, WV 25314-1742 / US
05 / MOSSER, Daniel, W.
910 Meadow Drive
South Charleston, WV 25309 / US
06 / FISCHER, Donald, A.
1056 Lakeview Drive
Cross Lanes, WV 25313 / US
07 / OLSON, Robert, D.
2638 Conner Drive
Charleston, WV 25302 / US
08 / SWECKER, James, L.
165 Elk River Rd. S.
Clendenin, WV 25045 / US
09 / SMITH, Cloid, Russell
1909 Huber Road
Charleston, WV 25314-2233 / US
 [2013/43]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
5th Floor, Salisbury Square House
8, Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/15]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2013/43]Haslam, Simon David , et al
Abel & Imray
20, Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
Application number, filing date11806052.413.12.2011
[2018/15]
WO2011US64525
Priority number, dateUS201061424300P17.12.2010         Original published format: US 201061424300 P
[2013/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012082674
Date:21.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2651982
Date:23.10.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2012
[2013/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2651982
Date:11.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:C08F6/00, B01D53/14, C08J11/02, C07C7/00, B01D53/00, F25J3/06, F25J3/08, // C08L23/00
[2017/44]
Former International [2013/43]C08F6/00, B01D53/14, C08J11/02, C07C7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN AUS EINEM POLYOLEFINSPÜLGASPRODUKT[2013/43]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR RECOVERING HYDROCARBONS FROM A POLYOLEFIN PURGE GAS PRODUCT[2013/43]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE RÉCUPÉRATION D'HYDROCARBURES À PARTIR D'UN PRODUIT GAZ DE PURGE DE POLYOLÉFINE[2013/43]
Entry into regional phase04.06.2013National basic fee paid 
04.06.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/43]
17.01.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.03.2018Fee for grant paid
02.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.08.2015
Opposition(s)14.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
05.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/12]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL11.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1302478  (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [X] 1-25 * paragraph [0021]; figure 1 *;
 [X]EP1302233  (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [X] 1-25 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0027]; example 1 *;
 [E]WO2012006387  (UNIVATION TECH LLC [US], et al) [E] 1-25 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraphs [0062] , [0073] *
by applicantEP1302478
 EP1302233
 US3709853
 US4003712
 US4011382
 US4302566
 US4543399
 US4588790
 US4882400
 US5028670
 US5352749
 US5405922
 US5541270
 US5627242
 US5665818
 US5677375
 US6255426
 EP0802202
 EP0794200
 EP0649992
 EP0634421
 US4271060
 US4613484
 US5001205
 US5236998
 US5589555
 US5436304
 US7122607
 WO2005113615
 US7179876
 US7169864
 US7157531
 US7129302
 US6995109
 US6958306
 US6884748
 US6689847
 US5026798
 US5703187
 US5747406
 US6069213
 US7244795
 US7579415
 US2007055028
 WO9722635
 WO0069922
 WO0130860
 WO0130861
 WO0246246
 WO0250088
 WO2004022230
 WO2004026921
 WO2006019494
 WO9901460
 EP0893454
 EP0894005
 US5318935
 US5889128
 US6333389
 US6271325
 EP0103120
 EP1102503
 EP0231102
 EP0703246
 USRE33683E
 US4115639
 US4077904
 US4302565
 US4482687
 US4564605
 US4721763
 US4879359
 US4960741
 US5518973
 US5525678
 US5288933
 US5290745
 US5093415
 US6562905
 US2008194780
 US6989344
 WO2004060923
 US4701432
 US4808561
 US4912075
 US4925821
 US4937217
 US5008228
 US5238892
 US5240894
 US5332706
 US5346925
 US5422325
 US5466649
 US5466766
 US5468702
 US5529965
 US5554704
 US5629253
 US5639835
 US5625015
 US5643847
 US5665665
 US5698487
 US5714424
 US5723400
 US5723402
 US5731261
 US5759940
 US5767032
 US5770664
 US5972510
 WO9532995
 WO9514044
 WO9606187
 WO9702297
 WO9947598
 WO9948605
 WO9950311
 US4877587
 US4933149
 US6627713
 US6548610
 US2010142050
 WO2008045173
 WO2008045172
 EP0229368
 US5283278
 US4803251
 US4555370
 US4994534
 US5200477
 WO2009023111
 WO0144322