Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2593906

EP2593906 - HIGH EFFICIENCY COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY WITH OPTIMIZED RECURSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.04.2013
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jarisch, Wolfram R.
11102 Candlelight Lane
Potomac, MD 20854 / US
[2013/21]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2013/21]
Representative(s)Appleyard Lees IP LLP
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/21]Waddington, Richard , et al
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date11807508.414.07.2011
WO2011US44005
Priority number, dateUS2010083820516.07.2010         Original published format: US 838205
[2013/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012009535
Date:19.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2593906
Date:22.05.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2012
[2013/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.01.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06T11/00, G06K9/00
[2016/30]
Former International [2013/21]G06K9/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/21]
TitleGerman:HOCHLEISTUNGSCOMPUTERTOMOGRAPHIE MIT OPTIMIERTEN REKURSIONEN[2013/21]
English:HIGH EFFICIENCY COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY WITH OPTIMIZED RECURSIONS[2013/21]
French:TOMODENSITOMÉTRIE HAUTE PERFORMANCE À RÉCURSIVITÉS OPTIMISÉES[2013/21]
Entry into regional phase13.02.2013National basic fee paid 
13.02.2013Search fee paid 
13.02.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
13.02.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.02.2013Examination requested  [2013/21]
25.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201303   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2009158718  (JARISCH WOLFRAM R [US]) [X] 1-7,9-12,15-20 * abstract * * figure 1 * * figure 2 * * figure 3 * * Eq. 3 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0063] * [Y] 8,13,14;
 [XY]WO2010030750  (SAMPLIFY SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-12,15-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * [Y] 8,13,14;
 [A]US2008118020  (THIBAULT JEAN-BAPTISTE DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6018562  (WILLSON PAUL D [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2009324047  (JARISCH WOLFRAM R [US]);
 [Y]US2010070836  (WEGENER ALBERT W [US], et al);
 [A]WO2009158718  (JARISCH WOLFRAM R [US]);
 [A]US2008118020  (THIBAULT JEAN-BAPTISTE DANIEL [US], et al);
 [A]US6018562  (WILLSON PAUL D [US])