blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2593906 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2593906



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 195
19.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.08.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
19.08.2019 Claims Search / examination 5
19.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.08.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
25.06.2019 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
17.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.06.2019 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.02.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
20.02.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.01.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
25.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.01.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
25.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
25.01.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
25.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.01.2017 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
15.07.2016 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
29.06.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.06.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 6
29.06.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
29.06.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
16.06.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
12.02.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.12.2015 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
10.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.12.2015 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
10.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.02.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.02.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
04.09.2013 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
24.04.2013 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.02.2013 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
13.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.02.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
06.02.2013 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
23.11.2012 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
09.02.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 58
19.01.2012 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
19.01.2012 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 46