blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2593906


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.02.2019 First examination report
16.02.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
31.07.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.08.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.01.2017 Amendment by applicant
29.07.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.06.2016 Change - classification published on  27.07.2016  [2016/30]
24.06.2016 Change - classification published on  27.07.2016  [2016/30]
24.06.2016 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  27.07.2016  [2016/30]
29.07.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.02.2015 Change - representative
31.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.11.2013 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
05.11.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.09.2013 Change - extension states published on  23.10.2013  [2013/43]
30.08.2013 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
19.04.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.05.2013  [2013/21]
19.04.2013 Request for examination filed published on  22.05.2013  [2013/21]
12.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
18.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
04.02.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
20.01.2012 PCT data prior to European publication