Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2593906

Designated contracting statesAL 
AT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
RS 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Examination procedure19.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Entry into regional phase13.02.2013National basic fee paid 
13.02.2013Search fee paid 
13.02.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
13.02.2013Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201303   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2013
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:22.05.2013 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20130213
 
Event date:22.05.2013 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:23.10.2013 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:27.07.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06K 9/00 20060101ALI20160623BHEP
 
Event date:27.07.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06T 11/00 20060101AFI20160623BHEP
 
Event date:27.07.2016 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED (CORRECTED)
Effective DATE:20160629
 
Event date:27.03.2019 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20190220