EP2658599 - IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE FIXATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | [2013/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, Thomas A. 7712 - 53rd Avenue North New Hope, MN 55428 / US | 02 /
NIPPOLT, Douglas D. 1778 Partridge Place Centerville, MN 55038 / US | 03 /
SWENSON, Richard W. 4019 Kipling Avenue Edina, MN 55416 / US | 04 /
GRUBAC, Vladimir 6256 Decatur Avenue North Brooklyn Park, MN 55428 / US | 05 /
BONNER, Matthew D. 18400 - 5th Avenue North Plymouth, MN 55447 / US | 06 /
USHER, Raymond W. 911 - 138th Lane NE Ham Lake, MN 55304 / US | 07 /
ALFOQAHA, Arshad A. 9751 Geisler Road Eden Prairie, MN 55347 / US | [2016/43] |
Former [2013/45] | 01 /
ANDERSON, Thomas A. 7712 - 53rd Avenue North New Hope Minnesota 55428 / US | ||
02 /
NIPPOLT, Douglas D. 1778 Partridge Place Centerville Minnesota 55038 / US | |||
03 /
SWENSON, Richard W. 4019 Kipling Avenue Edina Minnesota 55416 / US | |||
04 /
GRUBAC, Vladimir 6256 Decatur Avenue North Brooklyn Park Minnesota 55428 / US | |||
05 /
BONNER, Matthew D. 18400 - 5th Avenue North Plymouth Minnesota 55447 / US | |||
06 /
USHER, Raymond W. 911 - 138th Lane NE Ham Lake Minnesota 55304 / US | |||
07 /
ALFOQAHA, Arshad A. 9751 Geisler Road Eden Prairie Minnesota 55347 / US | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2013/45] | Application number, filing date | 11807840.1 | 21.12.2011 | [2016/43] | WO2011US66540 | Priority number, date | US201061428067P | 29.12.2010 Original published format: US 201061428067 P | US201113096881 | 28.04.2011 Original published format: US201113096881 | US201113284761 | 28.10.2011 Original published format: US201113284761 | [2013/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012092074 | Date: | 05.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2658599 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2658599 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
A61N1/37205 (EP,US);
A61N1/0573 (US);
A61N1/37518 (EP,US);
A61N1/3756 (EP,US);
A61N1/3629 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPLANTIERBARE MEDIZINISCHE FIXATION | [2013/45] | English: | IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE FIXATION | [2013/45] | French: | FIXATION POUR DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL IMPLANTABLE | [2013/45] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/45] | 03.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 20.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16185641.4 / EP3132824 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2011 | AL | 26.10.2016 | AT | 26.10.2016 | CY | 26.10.2016 | CZ | 26.10.2016 | DK | 26.10.2016 | EE | 26.10.2016 | ES | 26.10.2016 | FI | 26.10.2016 | HR | 26.10.2016 | IT | 26.10.2016 | LT | 26.10.2016 | LV | 26.10.2016 | MC | 26.10.2016 | MK | 26.10.2016 | PL | 26.10.2016 | RO | 26.10.2016 | RS | 26.10.2016 | SI | 26.10.2016 | SK | 26.10.2016 | SM | 26.10.2016 | TR | 26.10.2016 | LU | 21.12.2016 | MT | 21.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | BG | 26.01.2017 | GB | 26.01.2017 | NO | 26.01.2017 | GR | 27.01.2017 | IS | 26.02.2017 | PT | 27.02.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 21.12.2011 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MK | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
TR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GB | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 21.12.2011 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MK | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GB | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.12.2011 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MK | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GB | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GB | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 26.10.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2005028023 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10 * abstract * [Y] 3 [I] 11; | [X]US2006085041 (HASTINGS ROGER N [US], et al) [X] 1,4-9,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0111] *; | [X]WO2007022180 (SYNECOR LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [Y]US6136005 (GOODE LOUIS B [US], et al) [Y] 3 * abstract * * column 2, line 37 - line 41 *; | [A]WO2009039400 (NANOSTIM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | by applicant | US20100696890 |