Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2655466

EP2655466 - ADHESIVE FOR ROTOR BLADES FOR WIND POWER PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.04.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
14.06.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sika Technology AG
Zugerstrasse 50
6340 Baar / CH
[2013/44]
Inventor(s)01 / PIND, Martin
28 Jing Dong Road
Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou 215121 / CN
02 / OLSEN, Bodil
Holmgaardsparken 20
DK-3320 Skaevinge / DK
 [2013/44]
Representative(s)Sika Patent Attorneys
c/o Sika Technology AG
Corp. IP Dept.
Tüffenwies 16
Postfach
8048 Zürich / CH
[2014/42]
Former [2013/44]Sika Patent Attorneys
C/o Sika Technology AG Tüffenwies 16 Postfach
8048 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date11807904.520.12.2011
WO2011EP73392
Priority number, dateEP2010019696224.12.2010         Original published format: EP 10196962
[2013/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012084937
Date:28.06.2012
Language:DE
[2012/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2655466
Date:30.10.2013
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2012
[2013/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2655466
Date:15.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:C08G18/32, C08G18/36, C08G18/48, C09J175/04
[2013/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KLEBSTOFF FÜR ROTORBLÄTTER FÜR WINDKRAFTANLAGEN[2013/44]
English:ADHESIVE FOR ROTOR BLADES FOR WIND POWER PLANTS[2013/44]
French:ADHÉSIF POUR PALES DE ROTOR POUR ÉOLIENNES[2013/44]
Entry into regional phase24.07.2013National basic fee paid 
24.07.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
24.07.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/44]
13.06.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2014Fee for grant paid
03.09.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.09.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.06.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.07.2015   
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2015/34]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
19.08.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.02.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
12.04.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.04.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition12.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1351/17
15.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
14.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.12.2011
AL15.10.2014
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
IT15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MK15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
TR15.10.2014
IE20.12.2014
LU20.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
AT20.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU20.12.2011
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
IT15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MK15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
TR15.10.2014
IE20.12.2014
LU20.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
AT20.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/24]HU20.12.2011
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
IT15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
TR15.10.2014
IE20.12.2014
LU20.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
AT20.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/51]HU20.12.2011
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
IT15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
TR15.10.2014
IE20.12.2014
LU20.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2016/33]HU20.12.2011
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
IT15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
TR15.10.2014
IE20.12.2014
LU20.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2016/32]HU20.12.2011
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
IT15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
IE20.12.2014
LU20.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2016/31]BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
IT15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
IE20.12.2014
LU20.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2016/27]CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
IT15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
IE20.12.2014
LU20.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2016/22]CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
IT15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
IE20.12.2014
LU20.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2016/12]CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
IT15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
IE20.12.2014
LU20.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/46]CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
IT15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
IE20.12.2014
LU20.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/37]CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
IT15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
LU20.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/36]CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
LU20.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/35]CY15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
LU20.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/30]CY15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
BE31.12.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/26]CY15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/24]FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/23]FI15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/22]LT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/21]LT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
Former [2015/20]LT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
Former [2015/16]NL15.10.2014
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2009080740  (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE], et al) [AD] 1-16 * page 3, line 8 - page 3, line 10 * * page 4, line 16 - page 5, line 20 * * page 14, line 18 - page 14, line 24 * * examples 1,2 * * claims 1,2,8,14 *;
 [A]EP1690880  (SIKA TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0021] * * examples 1,2 * * claims 1,7,8,15,18 *;
 [A]WO02066572  (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * examples 1-4 * * claims 1,4-6,9 *
by applicantWO2006084900
 WO2009080740
OppositionEP0822445
 WO2007031505
    - "Dianol 320 Flakes Datasheet", Seppic, (20020300), XP055366035
    - "Simulsol TOMB", Seppic, (20020500), pages 1 - 4, XP055366038
    - "Voranol CP 755", Dow Chemical Company, (20001000), pages 1 - 2, XP055366043
    - "Lupranol 3423", Technisches Datenblatt zu Lupranol 3423, (20140000), XP055366052
    - "Voranol RN 490 Material Datasheet", Dow Chemical Company, (20140800), pages 1 - 6, XP055366079