Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2656350

EP2656350 - METHODS OF GENERATING ENERGY AND/OR HE-4 USING GRAPHENE BASED MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Database last updated on 23.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2017New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cooper, Christopher H.
2 Pine Street
Windsor, VT 05089 / US
For all designated states
Cooper, William K.
224 E. Buena Vista
Santa Fe, NM 87505 / US
For all designated states
Loan, James F.
10 Spencer Drive
Bellows Falls, VT 05101 / US
[2013/44]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2013/44]
Representative(s)Harris, Jennifer Lucy
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
[2013/44]
Application number, filing date11808546.322.12.2011
WO2011US66992
Priority number, dateUS201061427140P24.12.2010         Original published format: US 201061427140 P
[2013/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012088472
Date:28.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2656350
Date:30.10.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2012
[2013/44]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP28.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:G21B3/00
[2013/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/44]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON ENERGIE UND/ODER HE-4 MIT MATERIALIEN AUF GRAPHENBASIS[2013/44]
English:METHODS OF GENERATING ENERGY AND/OR HE-4 USING GRAPHENE BASED MATERIALS[2013/44]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE GÉNÉRATION D'ÉNERGIE ET/OU 4HE UTILISANT DES MATÉRIAUX À BASE DE GRAPHÈNE[2017/22]
Former [2013/44]PROCÉDÉS DE GÉNÉRATION D'ÉNERGIE ET/OU 4HE UTILISANT DES MATÉRIAUX À BASE DE GRAPHÈNE& xA;
Entry into regional phase24.07.2013National basic fee paid 
24.07.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
24.07.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/44]
17.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.12.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201505   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.2016
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US2008123793  (LOAN JAMES F [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,18,26,28,29,36,37,39 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0074] * [A] 13,32 [I] 7,8,10,12,16,17,22,23,25;
 [XA]WO2007102860  (SELDON TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,9,18,26,28-30,36,37,39 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0062] * [A] 13,21,32,38;
 [A]WO2005065095  (GAIDIS JAMES MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1,18,26,36 * page 7, line 14 - page 9, line 12 *;
 [A]EP1551032  (OSAKA IND PROMOTION ORG [JP]) [A] 1,18,26,36 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0044] *
by applicant   - JOEL I. GERSTEN; FREDERICK W. SMITH, The Physics and Chemistry of Materials, WILEY PUBLISHERS, pages 382 - 383,
    - "The Particle Atlas, (An encyclopedia of techniques for small particle identification", WALTER C. MCCRONE'S ET AL., Principles and Techniques, ANN ARBOR SCIENCE PUB, vol. I,
    - Y E. KIM, THE 1TFH INTERNATIONAL CONF ON CONDENSED MATTER NUCLEAR SCI., (20091005),
    - "The Effective Fine-Structure Constant of Freestanding Graphene Measured in Graphite", SCIENCE, (20101105), vol. 330, no. 6005, pages 805 - 808,
    - LIPSON, PHYS. REV. B 77, 081405(R, (2008),
    - APS meeting, DENVER CO, (20070305),
    - RAO; DONG, J. VAC. SCI. TECHNOL. A, vol. 15, no. 3,