EP2654731 - SOLID RETARD FORMULATIONS BASED ON SOLID DISPERSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AbbVie Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Mainzer Strasse 81 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [2016/10] |
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states Abbott GmbH & Co. KG Max-Planck-Ring 2 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNDL, Gunther Apfelgasse 13 67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | 02 /
WEIS, Juergen Am Lindenbaum 21 60433 Frankfurt/Main / DE | 03 /
GRANZOW, Dietrich Roseggerstr. 3 67065 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
LIEPOLD, Bernd Birkenweg 44 69221 Dossenheim / DE | 05 /
LANDER, Ute Ratsteig 1 67814 Dannenfels / DE | 06 /
WESTEDT, Ulrich Weinheimer Str. 2 69198 Schriesheim / DE | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstraße 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/30] | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/44] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11808863.2 | 22.12.2011 | [2016/30] | WO2011EP73850 | Priority number, date | EP20100196936 | 23.12.2010 Original published format: EP 10196936 | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012085236 | Date: | 28.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2654731 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2654731 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K47/32, A61K47/34 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
A61K9/146 (EP,US);
A61K47/34 (US);
A61K31/167 (US);
A61K31/192 (US);
A61K31/216 (US);
A61K47/32 (US);
A61K9/00 (US);
A61K9/2095 (EP,US);
A61K9/2027 (EP,US);
A61K9/2031 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FESTE VERZÖGERUNGSFORMULIERUNGEN BASIEREND AUF FESTDISPERGIERUNGEN | [2015/47] | English: | SOLID RETARD FORMULATIONS BASED ON SOLID DISPERSIONS | [2013/44] | French: | FORMULATIONS SOLIDES À LIBÉRATION PROLONGÉE POUR DISPERSIONS SOLIDES | [2015/47] |
Former [2013/44] | FESTE VERZÖGERUNGSFORMULIERUNGEN AUF DER BASIS VON FESTEN DISPERSIONEN | ||
Former [2013/44] | FORMULATIONS RETARD SOLIDES À BASE DE DISPERSIONS SOLIDES | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 07.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2011 | AL | 27.07.2016 | CY | 27.07.2016 | CZ | 27.07.2016 | EE | 27.07.2016 | FI | 27.07.2016 | HR | 27.07.2016 | LT | 27.07.2016 | LV | 27.07.2016 | MC | 27.07.2016 | MK | 27.07.2016 | RS | 27.07.2016 | SI | 27.07.2016 | SK | 27.07.2016 | SM | 27.07.2016 | BG | 27.10.2016 | NO | 27.10.2016 | IS | 27.11.2016 | LU | 22.12.2016 | MT | 22.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 22.12.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
LU | 22.12.2016 | ||
MT | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 22.12.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
LU | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
LU | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 27.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [I]US4769236 (PANOZ DONALD E [IE], et al) [I] 1-10 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 2; claim 1 *; | [I]WO2009050289 (ABBOTT GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [I] 1-10 * page 1, line 23 - page 2, line 20; claims 1-12 *; | [I]WO2010000740 (ABBOTT GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [I] 1-10 * page 2, line 15 - line 41; claim - * * page 5, line 4 - line 7 * * page 11, line 23 - page 12, line 21 *; | [I]WO2010130728 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [I] 1-10 * page 1, line 20 - page 4, line 19; claim 1 *; | [A] - SERAJUDDIN ET AL, "SOLID DISPERSION OF POORLY WATER-SOUBLE DRUGS: EARLY PROMISES, SUBSEQUENT PROBLEMS, AND RECENT BREAKTHROUGHS", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION, WASHINGTON, US, (19991001), vol. 88, no. 10, doi:DOI:10.1021/JS980403L, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 1058 - 1066, XP000851882 [A] 1-10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/js980403l | by applicant | DE1077430 | EP0219048 | EP0240904 | EP0240906 | EP0544144 | WO9625151 | WO0134119 | WO2007115381 | - JANSSENS ET AL., EUR J PHARM SCI, (2007), vol. 30, pages 288 - 294 | - SIX ET AL., J PHARM SCI, (2004), vol. 93, no. 1, pages 124 - 131 | - J. M. HARRIS, Chemistry: Biotechnical and Biomedical Applications, PLENUM PRESS |