Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2668229 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2668229



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 4426
13.03.2024 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
13.03.2024 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
13.03.2024 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
01.02.2024 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
27.12.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.12.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
27.12.2023 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 1
27.12.2023 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 6
25.10.2023 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 42
25.10.2023 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 42
25.10.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
25.10.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
25.10.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
25.10.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
26.09.2023 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
26.09.2023 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
26.09.2023 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
26.09.2023 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
26.09.2023 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
26.09.2023 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
21.09.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.09.2023 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 11 Appeal 3
21.09.2023 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 12 Appeal 3
21.09.2023 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 13 Appeal 3
21.09.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 13
21.09.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 13
21.09.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.09.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.09.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.09.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.09.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.09.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.09.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.09.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.09.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.09.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.09.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.09.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
23.08.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.08.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.08.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
23.08.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
22.08.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.08.2023 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
22.08.2023 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
22.08.2023 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
22.08.2023 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
22.08.2023 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
22.08.2023 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
22.08.2023 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
22.08.2023 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
22.08.2023 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 Appeal 4
22.08.2023 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 Appeal 4
22.08.2023 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 09 Appeal 4
22.08.2023 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 10 Appeal 4
22.08.2023 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 11 Appeal 3
22.08.2023 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 12 Appeal 3
22.08.2023 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 13 Appeal 3
22.08.2023 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 14 Appeal 3
22.08.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.08.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 28
22.08.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.07.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.07.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.07.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.07.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.07.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.07.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.07.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.07.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.07.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.07.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.07.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.07.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.07.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.07.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.07.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.07.2023 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 22
07.07.2023 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 22
07.07.2023 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 22
06.07.2023 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 23
06.07.2023 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 23
06.07.2023 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 23
06.07.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.07.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.07.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.07.2023 General enquiry Appeal 1
05.07.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.03.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.03.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.03.2023 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 5
14.03.2023 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 5
14.03.2023 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 5
10.03.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.03.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.03.2023 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 3
08.03.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.03.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.03.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.03.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.03.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.03.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.03.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.03.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.03.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.03.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.03.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.03.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
27.02.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.02.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.02.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
26.02.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.02.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.02.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.02.2023 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
23.02.2023 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
23.02.2023 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
24.01.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.01.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.01.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.01.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.01.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
13.12.2022 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
13.12.2022 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
13.12.2022 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
13.12.2022 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
13.12.2022 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
13.12.2022 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
08.12.2022 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
07.12.2022 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
19.10.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.10.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.10.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.10.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.10.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.10.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.10.2022 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
13.10.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.10.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
13.10.2022 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
07.09.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.09.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.09.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.09.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.09.2022 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
03.08.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.08.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.07.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.07.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.07.2022 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 15
28.07.2022 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.03.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.03.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.03.2022 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
09.03.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.03.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.03.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.03.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 3
04.03.2022 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
04.03.2022 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
04.03.2022 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
04.03.2022 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 43
04.03.2022 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 21
04.03.2022 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 9
04.03.2022 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 1
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 31
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 13
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 39
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 96
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 62
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 20
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 25
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 40
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 14
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 30
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 15
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 71
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 43
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
04.03.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 23
04.03.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.03.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
04.03.2022 Reply to appeal Appeal 72
04.03.2022 Reply to appeal Appeal 58
25.11.2021 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
26.10.2021 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.10.2021 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.10.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.10.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 Appeal 6
20.10.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 Appeal 6
20.10.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 Appeal 6
20.10.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 Appeal 5
20.10.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 Appeal 5
20.10.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 Appeal 6
20.10.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 Appeal 6
20.10.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 Appeal 6
20.10.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 Appeal 6
20.10.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 Appeal 6
20.10.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 Appeal 6
20.10.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 Appeal 6
20.10.2021 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
20.10.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.10.2021 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
20.10.2021 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 29
06.08.2021 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
06.08.2021 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
06.08.2021 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
30.07.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.07.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
30.07.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 4
30.07.2021 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
29.07.2021 Communication confirming withdrawal from representation Opposition 1
29.07.2021 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 2
28.07.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
28.07.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
28.07.2021 Submission concerning change of proprietor's representative Opposition 1
23.07.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.07.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.07.2021 Submission concerning change of proprietor's representative Opposition 1
16.06.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.06.2021 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.06.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.06.2021 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.06.2021 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.06.2021 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
10.06.2021 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
10.06.2021 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
10.06.2021 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 18
10.06.2021 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
10.06.2021 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
10.06.2021 Means of redress Opposition 2
10.06.2021 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
10.06.2021 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
10.06.2021 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
10.06.2021 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.06.2021 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 36
10.06.2021 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 64
10.06.2021 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 64
10.06.2021 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 64
20.05.2021 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.05.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
18.05.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
18.05.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
14.05.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.05.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 051 Opposition 4
14.05.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 052 Opposition 9
14.05.2021 Consolidated list of cited opposition documents Opposition 3
14.05.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
14.05.2021 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
05.05.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.05.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 049 Opposition 2
05.05.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 050 Opposition 3
05.05.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
05.05.2021 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
20.04.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.04.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
29.03.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.03.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.03.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.03.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.03.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.03.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
19.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
19.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
19.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 Opposition 6
19.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 Opposition 6
19.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 Opposition 6
19.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 Opposition 6
19.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 Opposition 6
19.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 Opposition 6
19.03.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 044 Opposition 7
19.03.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 045 Opposition 7
19.03.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 046 Opposition 2
19.03.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 046 Opposition 3
19.03.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 047 Opposition 4
19.03.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 048 Opposition 4
19.03.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 3
19.03.2021 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 21
18.03.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.03.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.03.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 042 Opposition 13
18.03.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 043 Opposition 15
18.03.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
18.03.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.03.2021 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.03.2021 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 10
03.03.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.03.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
13.02.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.02.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
10.02.2021 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
10.02.2021 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
10.02.2021 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
19.11.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.11.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.11.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
16.11.2020 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
30.10.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
30.10.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.10.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
26.10.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.10.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.10.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.10.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.10.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.10.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.10.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.10.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.10.2020 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.10.2020 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.10.2020 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
09.10.2020 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
09.10.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
09.10.2020 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
24.09.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.09.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.09.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.09.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.09.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.09.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.09.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.09.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.09.2020 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 27
21.09.2020 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2020 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2020 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.09.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.09.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.09.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.09.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
04.09.2020 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
25.08.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
25.08.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
11.08.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.08.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.08.2020 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.08.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.08.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.08.2020 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
28.07.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
28.07.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
28.07.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
22.06.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.06.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
15.06.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 041 Opposition 9
15.06.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
15.06.2020 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
26.03.2020 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
25.03.2020 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
25.03.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.03.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.03.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.03.2020 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 2
18.02.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.02.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.02.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.02.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
13.02.2020 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.02.2020 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
10.02.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.02.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.02.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.02.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.02.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.01.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
30.01.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
30.01.2020 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
21.01.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.01.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
03.01.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
03.01.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.01.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.01.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 2
23.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.12.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.12.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.12.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.12.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 7
20.12.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 7
20.12.2019 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 2
18.12.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.12.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.12.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.12.2019 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
18.12.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.12.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.12.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.12.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
17.12.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
16.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.12.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
16.12.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
09.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
09.12.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
09.12.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
25.11.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.11.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.11.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.11.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
15.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
15.11.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 013 Opposition 8
15.11.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 025 Opposition 2
15.11.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 026 Opposition 1
15.11.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 027 Opposition 3
15.11.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 028 Opposition 18
15.11.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 029 Opposition 12
15.11.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 030 Opposition 2
15.11.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 031 Opposition 6
15.11.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 032 Opposition 19
15.11.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 033 Opposition 36
15.11.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 034 Opposition 9
15.11.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 035 Opposition 6
15.11.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 036 Opposition 20
15.11.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 037 Opposition 14
15.11.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 038 Opposition 71
15.11.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 039 Opposition 1
15.11.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 040 Opposition 1
15.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
15.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
15.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
15.11.2019 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Opposition 5
15.11.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 34
15.11.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 43
12.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2019 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Opposition 11
07.08.2019 Observations by third parties Opposition 8
07.08.2019 Observations by third parties Opposition 2
26.06.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.05.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.05.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
29.04.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 024 Opposition 7
29.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
29.04.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.04.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.04.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.04.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
15.04.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.04.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.04.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.04.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.04.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 23
12.04.2019 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
12.04.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.04.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.04.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.2018 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
13.12.2018 Request concerning the applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.11.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
14.11.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 Opposition 6
14.11.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 Opposition 6
14.11.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 Opposition 6
14.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
14.11.2018 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 18
27.09.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.09.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.09.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 022 Opposition 4
11.09.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 023 Opposition 2
11.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.09.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
04.07.2018 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
04.07.2018 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
04.07.2018 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.07.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.07.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.07.2018 Request for the date of publication in citations Opposition 1
25.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
25.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
25.06.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.06.2018 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
12.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
12.06.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.06.2018 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
06.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 005 Opposition 6
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 006 Opposition 4
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 007 Opposition 96
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 008 Opposition 30
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 008 Opposition 11
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 009 Opposition 39
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 010 Opposition 9
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 010 Opposition 9
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 011 Opposition 5
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 012 Opposition 43
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 012 Opposition 10
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 013 Opposition 8
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 013 Opposition 31
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 014 Opposition 8
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 015 Opposition 10
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 016 Opposition 8
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 016 Opposition 25
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 017 Opposition 6
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 017 Opposition 13
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 018 Opposition 4
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 018 Opposition 8
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 019 Opposition 15
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 019 Opposition 7
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 020 Opposition 23
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 020 Opposition 62
06.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 021 Opposition 11
06.06.2018 General authorisation Opposition 1
06.06.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
06.06.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 21
06.06.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
31.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
31.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 001 Opposition 44
31.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 002 Opposition 4
31.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 003 Opposition 40
31.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 004 Opposition 2
31.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
31.05.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 23
31.05.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
07.09.2017 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
10.08.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.07.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
25.07.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
25.07.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 7
25.07.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.03.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.03.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
15.03.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
15.03.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 43
15.03.2017 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 43
02.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.12.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 46
02.12.2016 Description Search / examination 35
02.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.12.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.11.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
04.11.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.10.2016 Claims Search / examination 6
14.10.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.08.2016 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
16.08.2016 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 241
09.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
09.08.2016 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 14
09.08.2016 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 23
09.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 14
09.08.2016 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 13
09.08.2016 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 10
09.08.2016 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 8
09.08.2016 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 8
09.08.2016 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 24
09.08.2016 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 14
09.08.2016 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 15
09.08.2016 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 40
09.08.2016 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 17
09.08.2016 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 40
22.06.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
22.06.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.03.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
18.09.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
18.09.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.07.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
03.07.2015 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 17
20.01.2015 Observations by third parties Search / examination 16
26.09.2014 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
06.11.2013 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
03.09.2013 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
30.08.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.08.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.08.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.08.2013 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
17.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.07.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
17.07.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
17.07.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
07.06.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
22.08.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 64
02.08.2012 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
02.08.2012 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 57
23.02.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII International Searching Authority 2
23.02.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet International Searching Authority 1
23.02.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box International Searching Authority 3
11.01.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
11.01.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 14
11.01.2012 Description International Searching Authority 40
11.01.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 2