Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793646

EP2793646 - TISSUE CLEANER AND ORAL CARE IMPLEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JIMENEZ, Eduardo J.
21 Manor Drive
Manalapan, New Jersey 07726 / US
02 / MOSKOVICH, Robert
20 Jensen Street
East Brunswick, New Jersey 08816 / US
03 / WECHSLER, Andreas
Alfred-Kubin-Strasse 11
A-5700 Zell am See / AT
04 / STORZ, Joachim
Von Goetz Weg 15-16
A-5700 Zell am See / AT
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Thum, Bernhard , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
Application number, filing date11809039.821.12.2011
[2016/10]
WO2011US66576
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013095454
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793646
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2793646
Date:09.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A46B9/00
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:GEWEBEREINIGER UND MUNDPFLEGEVORRICHTUNG[2014/44]
English:TISSUE CLEANER AND ORAL CARE IMPLEMENT[2014/44]
French:DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE DE TISSUS ET ACCESSOIRE DE SOINS BUCCAUX[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase21.07.2014National basic fee paid 
21.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.10.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
03.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.2015Fee for grant paid
15.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.08.2015
Opposition(s)12.12.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
05.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.12.2011
AL09.03.2016
AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
MK09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
TR09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU21.12.2011
AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
MK09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
TR09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2018/30]HU21.12.2011
AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
MK09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/47]AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/37]AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/19]AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/07]AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/03]AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2016/51]AT09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2016/50]AT09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/48]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/40]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Former [2016/39]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Former [2016/36]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Former [2016/35]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]US2005210612  (HOHLBEIN DOUGLAS [US] ET AL HOHLBEIN DOUGLAS J [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,8 * paragraphs [0062] , [0 63]; figures 12, 13, 15 *;
 [X]US2008208228  (MUELLER WOLF-DIETER [DE]) [X] 1-3,8 * paragraphs [0005] , [00 7] , [0 14] , [0 15] , [0 34] , [0 37]; figure - *;
 [X]US2011289702  (LEE WANG KEN [US]) [X] 1,2,8 * paragraphs [0025] , [0 27]; figures 3, 5, 9, 10 *;
 [X]KR200455480Y  (CJ LION CORP) [X] 1-3,8 * figure 10a *