Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2597799

EP2597799 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING CONTROL INFORMATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.01.2020New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yeouido-dong
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2013/22]
Inventor(s)01 / HAN, Seunghee
LG Institute
533 Hogye 1(il)-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
02 / CHUNG, Jaehoon
LG Institute
533 Hogye 1(il)-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
03 / LEE, Hyunwoo
LG Institute
533 Hogye 1(il)-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
04 / LEE, Moonil
LG Institute
533 Hogye 1(il)-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
05 / KO, Hyunsoo
LG Institute
533 Hogye 1(il)-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
 [2013/22]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/22]Urner, Peter
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date11809845.819.07.2011
WO2011KR05296
Priority number, dateKR2011007145719.07.2011         Original published format: KR 20110071457
US20100366164P21.07.2010         Original published format: US 366164 P
US20100365358P19.07.2010         Original published format: US 365358 P
[2013/22]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012011718
Date:26.01.2012
Language:KO
[2012/04]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2597799
Date:29.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR05.04.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04J11/00, H04B7/26, H04W88/02, H04L1/00, H04L5/00, H04B7/06
[2014/09]
Former International [2013/22]H04J11/00, H04B7/26, H04W24/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/22]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON STEUERUNGSINFORMATIONEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2013/22]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING CONTROL INFORMATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2013/22]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS DE CONTRÔLE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2013/22]
Entry into regional phase23.01.2013Translation filed 
23.01.2013National basic fee paid 
23.01.2013Search fee paid 
23.01.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
23.01.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/22]
28.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.01.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
25.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[E]WO2012077480  (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [E] 1-12 * page 91 - page 96 *;
 [XP]  - MOTOROLA MOBILITY, "Periodic CQI/PMI/RI reporting for CA", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-110296_PUCCH_FOR_CA_FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110113), vol. RAN WG1, no. Dublin, Ireland; 20110117, XP050490373 [XP] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PANASONIC, "Periodic CQI Reporting for Carrier Aggregation", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-103749, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100622), vol. RAN WG1, no. Dresden, Germany; 20100628, XP050449179 [A] 1-12 * section 2.2, case 4. *
International search[A]KR20090075750  (QUALCOMM INC [US]);
 [A]KR20100058399  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]);
 [A]KR20100019946  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]);
 [A]JP2008301253  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE)