Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2596454

EP2596454 - DATA READER HAVING COMPACT ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.12.2018
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.09.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Datalogic USA, Inc.
959 Terry Street
Eugene, OR 97402-9120 / US
[2018/07]
Former [2013/22]For all designated states
DATALOGIC ADC, INC.
959 Terry Street
Eugene, OR 97402-9120 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GAO, WenLiang
2719 Hallmark Lane
Eugene, OR 97405 / US
02 / SHEARIN, Alan
85239 Peaceful Valley Road
Eugene, OR 97405 / US
03 / ACOSTA, Jorge, L.
1754 Oakhurst Ct.
Eugene, OR 97402 / US
04 / THOMPSON, Ryan, B.
3866 Century Drive
Eugene, OR 97402 / US
05 / HUSS, Paul, R.
277 E. Rosewood Ave.
Eugene, OR 97405 / US
06 / HOSKINSON, Jeffrey, J.
3000 Memory Lane
Eugene, OR 97404 / US
 [2013/22]
Representative(s)Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Mauerkircherstraße 31
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/08]Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
Former [2013/22]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
Application number, filing date11810416.521.07.2011
[2018/08]
WO2011US44877
Priority number, dateUS20100367334P23.07.2010         Original published format: US 367334 P
[2013/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012012651
Date:26.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/04]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2596454
Date:29.05.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2012
[2013/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2596454
Date:21.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR08.03.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/10, G06K7/14
[2015/08]
Former International [2013/22]G06K7/10, G06K9/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DATENLESEGERÄT MIT KOMPAKTER ANORDNUNG[2013/22]
English:DATA READER HAVING COMPACT ARRANGEMENT[2013/22]
French:DISPOSITIF DE LECTURE DE DONNÉES QUI PRÉSENTE UN AGENCEMENT COMPACT[2013/22]
Entry into regional phase30.01.2013National basic fee paid 
30.01.2013Search fee paid 
30.01.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
30.01.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/22]
17.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2018Fee for grant paid
09.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.07.2016
Opposition(s)22.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
IE21.07.2018
LU21.07.2018
MT21.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/24]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
IE21.07.2018
LU21.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
Former [2019/21]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
IE21.07.2018
LU21.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
Former [2019/19]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
IE21.07.2018
LU21.07.2018
Former [2019/17]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
LU21.07.2018
Former [2019/15]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2019/13]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/36]CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
NO21.05.2018
Former [2018/35]CY21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
NO21.05.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2009001166  (BARKAN EDWARD [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0063]; figure 4 * [I] 2-5,7,9-12;
 [I]US2008277476  (KOTLARSKY ANATOLY [US], et al) [I] 1,8 * paragraph [0289]; figures 4H,23G *;
 [A]US5233172  (CHADIMA JR GEORGE E [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 2,4 *
International search[Y]US2007035718  (HADDAD WALEED S [US]);
 [Y]US2008191022  (BARKAN EDWARD D [US], et al);
 [A]US2009001166  (BARKAN EDWARD [US], et al);
 [A]US2008035733  (VINOGRADOV IGOR [US], et al);
 [A]US2004179254  (LEWIS JOHN R [US], et al)