Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2791281

EP2791281 - SYSTEM FOR THE CONVERSION OF BIOMASS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.12.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For:SM 
Shell Oil Company
One Shell Plaza P.O. Box 2463
Houston, TX 77252-2463 / US
For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR The Hague / NL
[2018/13]
Former [2014/43]For:SM 
Shell Oil Company
One Shell Plaza P.O. Box 2463
Houston, TX 77252-2463 / US
For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
Inventor(s)01 / FLOWERS, Thomas, Lamar
25615 Ryans Creek Ct.
Katy, Texas 77494 / US
02 / POWELL, Joseph, Broun
10506 Normont Drive
Houston, Texas 77070 / US
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Shell Legal Services IP
p/a Carel van Bylandtlaan 16
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Matthezing, Robert Maarten
Shell International B.V.
LSI
PO Box 384
2501 CJ The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date11811245.720.12.2011
WO2011US66237
Priority number, dateUS201161576691P16.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161576691 P
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013089799
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2791281
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:C10G3/00
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR UMWANDLUNG VON BIOMASSE[2014/43]
English:SYSTEM FOR THE CONVERSION OF BIOMASS[2014/43]
French:SYSTÈME DE CONVERSION D'UNE BIOMASSE[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase26.05.2014National basic fee paid 
26.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
29.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.12.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XY]US4485008  (MAA PETER S [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * see reactors 110,122 and line 1 of figure 1; see reactors 210,219,227 and lines 213 and 214 of figure 2; see reactors 310,318,331 ands lines 314, 313 of figure 3; see exampels 1-3 and col. 2, line 56; see examples 1-4; see claims 1-10 * [Y] 6;
 [XY]US2010000908  (MARKKANEN VARPU [FI], et al) [X] 1-9 * see reactors A,B,C,D and lines 6,11,18 of figures 1,2,3. * [Y] 1-18;
 [Y]EP2182047  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-20 * see figure 1, lines 40,41 and paragraphs[0013],[0014],[0079],[0083], [0094]; see examples 1-8, claims 1-8 *;
 [Y]US2008050792  (ZMIERCZAK WLODZIMIERZ W [US], et al) [Y] 10-20 * see [0016],[0041],][0050],[0060],[0078]; see claims 1-25 *;
 [Y]WO0011112  (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US]) [Y] 9-18 * see page 11, lines 18-22; see claims 1-26 *;
 [Y]EP0204354  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [Y] 9-18 * figure 1, steps A to E and recycle 2; see claims 1-9. *;
 [XY]US2007010682  (MYLLYOJA JUKKA [FI], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8 * see figure 1; see claims 1-20; examples 1-5,7; comparative example 6 * [Y] 6;
 [XY]  - ALAIN E. VERTÈS ET AL., BIOMASS TO BIOFUELS: STRATEGIES FOR GLOBAL INDUSTRIES, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (20100512), doi:10.1002/9780470750025, ISBN 9780470750025, XP002689545 [X] 1-9 * see points 16.2; 16.2.1; 20.4.9; 20.4.10; 20.4.11 * [Y] 1-20
 [Y]  - DRIFT VAN DER A ET AL, "ENTRAINED FLOW GASIFICATION OF BIOMASS - ASH BEHAVIOUR, FEEDING ISSUES AND SYSTEM ANALYSIS", INTERNET CITATION, (20040401), pages 1 - 58, URL: http://www.ecn.nl/docs/library/report/2004/c04039.pdf, (20040401), XP002679702 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document *