Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798896

EP2798896 - SCHEDULING ALGORITHM FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.09.2018
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2018(Expected) grantpublished on 17.10.2018  [2018/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via Gaetano Negri, 1
20123 Milano / IT
[2015/24]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Piazza degli Affari 2
20123 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / ACCONGIAGIOCO, Giovanni
Via G. Corigliano 5
I-88900 Crotone (KR) / IT
02 / ANDREOZZI, Matteo Maria
Università di Pisa
Dip. Ingegneria dell'Informazione
Via Caruso 16
I-56122 Pisa / IT
03 / CARETTI, Marco
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via G. Reiss Romoli 274
I-10148 Torino / IT
04 / FANTINI, Roberto
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via G. Reiss Romoli 274
I-10148 Torino / IT
05 / MIGLIORINI, Daniele
Università di Pisa
Dip. Ingegneria dell'Informazione
Via Caruso 16
I-56122 Pisa / IT
06 / SABELLA, Dario
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via G. Reiss Romoli 274
I-10148 Torino / IT
07 / STEA, Giovanni
Università di Pisa
Dip. Ingegneria dell'Informazione
Via Caruso 16
I-56122 Pisa / IT
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Maccalli, Marco , et al
Maccalli & Pezzoli S.r.l.
Via Settembrini, 40
20124 Milano / IT
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date11811354.729.12.2011
[2018/42]
WO2011EP74266
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013097904
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798896
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2798896
Date:17.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/12
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PLANNUNGSALGORITHMUS FÜR DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZE[2014/45]
English:SCHEDULING ALGORITHM FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORKS[2014/45]
French:ALGORITHME D'ORDONNANCEMENT POUR RÉSEAUX DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase23.07.2014National basic fee paid 
23.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
17.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2018Fee for grant paid
06.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2011170642  (WANG HAIFENG [CN], et al) [X] 1,11,12 * paragraphs [0080] - [0109] - [0118] * * figure 1 * [Y] 2-10,13-15;
 [Y]WO2011085817  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [Y] 2-10,13-15 * abstract * * page 8, line 21 - page 9, line 38 * * page 11, line 7 - page 15, line 31 *;
 [A]US2010195614  (NIMBALKER AJIT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0009] - [0024] , [0025] *;
 [A]US2011090808  (CHEN WANSHI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0012] - [0154] - [0162] - [0169] , [0175] *;
 [A]US2009296595  (KHOSHNEVIS AHMAD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0021] - [0033] , [0039] - [0041] *;
 [A]WO2008103979  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2010306613  (WU KEYING [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0054] , [0055] *;
 [A]  - ALCATEL-LUCENT, "Comparison of CSI Feedback Schemes", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-092310, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090624), no. Los Angeles, USA; 20090624, XP050350842 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
Examination   - TIAN LAN ET AL, "Resource Allocation and Performance Study for LTE Networks Integrated with Femtocells", GLOBECOM 2010, 2010 IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20101206), doi:10.1109/GLOCOM.2010.5684197, ISBN 978-1-4244-5636-9, pages 1 - 6, XP031846737

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.2010.5684197
by applicant   - ALEXEI GOROKHOV; DHANANJ AY A. GORE; AROGYASWAMI J. PAULRAJ, "Receive Antenna Selection for MIMO Spatial Multiplexing: Theory and Algorithms", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, (200311), vol. 51, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1109/TSP.2003.818204, XP011102796

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TSP.2003.818204