EP2656609 - METHOD OF PROCESSING A SEQUENCE OF CODED VIDEO FRAMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARRIS Enterprises LLC 3871 Lakefield Drive Suwanee, GA 30024 / US | [2017/31] |
Former [2016/13] | For all designated states Arris Enterprises, Inc. 3871 Lakefield Drive Suwanee, Georgia 30024 / US | ||
Former [2015/38] | For all designated states Arris Technology, Inc. 3871 Lakefield Drive Suwanee GA 30024 / US | ||
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states General instrument Corporation 101 Tournament Drive Horsham, PA 19044 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NARAYANAN, Muralidharan H-201 Springfields apt. Sarjapur Road Bellandur Gate Bangalore 560102 / IN | 02 /
DEL SORDO, Christopher S. 229 heatherfield Drive Souderton Pennsylvania 18964 / US | 03 /
MAHESWARAM, Surya P. M-19 Srila Park Pride Hydernagar 500049 / IN | 04 /
PANJE, Krishna Prasad 200 9th Main Arekere Mico Layout Bannerghatta Bangalore 560076 / IN | 05 /
SCHMITT, Ernest G. 932 Whitney Lane Maple Glen Pennsylvania 19002 / US | 06 /
ZHANG, Yaxi 67 Main Street Wayne Pennsylvania 19087 / US | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 11811444.6 | 15.12.2011 | WO2011US65008 | Priority number, date | US20100973257 | 20.12.2010 Original published format: US 973257 | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012087718 | Date: | 28.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2656609 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H04N21/00 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
H04N5/956 (EP,US);
H04N21/234 (KR);
H04N19/00 (KR);
H04N19/196 (EP,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,US);
H04N21/4147 (EP,US);
H04N21/43072 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINER SEQUENZ AUS KODIERTEN VIDEOFRAMES | [2013/44] | English: | METHOD OF PROCESSING A SEQUENCE OF CODED VIDEO FRAMES | [2013/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE SÉQUENCE DE TRAMES VIDÉO CODÉES | [2013/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 08.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 12.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.06.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/30] | 19.01.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/30] | Appeal following examination | 26.11.2021 | Appeal received No. T0142/22 | 26.11.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 19.01.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2016 | Request for further processing for: | 12.06.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 12.06.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.06.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US6081299 (KESSELRING WILLIAM DAVID [US]) [X] 1,12,16 * claim 1 *[I] 2-11,13-15,17-19; | [XI]WO2004056126 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,12,16 * page 4 * [I] 2-11,13-15,17-19 |