Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2652874 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2652874



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 335
26.08.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
18.07.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.07.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
02.07.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
02.07.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
04.04.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.04.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
04.04.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
04.04.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
04.04.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 32
11.03.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
08.03.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
07.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.03.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
07.03.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
07.03.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
07.03.2019 Description Search / examination 5
07.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.03.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
05.03.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
05.03.2019 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
05.03.2019 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
12.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
12.02.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
12.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.02.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
24.09.2018 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
24.09.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.09.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
07.09.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
07.09.2018 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
07.09.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
05.09.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 10
04.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.04.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
04.04.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
04.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.04.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
06.12.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
06.12.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.06.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.06.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
05.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
05.02.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
05.02.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
05.02.2016 Description Search / examination 2
05.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.02.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
12.10.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
12.10.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.10.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
22.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.01.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
22.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 10
22.01.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
22.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.11.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
22.11.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
22.11.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
25.09.2013 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
23.07.2013 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
19.07.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.2013 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
17.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.05.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.05.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
26.04.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
10.07.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 46
21.06.2012 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
21.06.2012 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 37
22.03.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
22.03.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
22.03.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2