Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2652874


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.07.2019 (Expected) grant published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
05.07.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
05.07.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
02.07.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
03.04.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.03.2019 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
12.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.09.2018 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
09.04.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.12.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.12.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.06.2016 Change - representative
09.02.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
09.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.10.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.10.2015 First examination report
10.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.02.2014 Change - extension states published on  26.03.2014  [2014/13]
25.01.2014 Amendment by applicant
29.11.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.09.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.10.2013  [2013/43]
20.09.2013 Request for examination filed published on  23.10.2013  [2013/43]
16.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
27.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
06.07.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
22.06.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
09.02.2012 PCT data prior to European publication