Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2652874

EP2652874 - PRE-EMPHASIS TECHNIQUE FOR ON-CHIP VOLTAGE-DRIVEN SINGLE-ENDED-TERMINATION DRIVERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2013/43]
Inventor(s)01 / MAAROUF, Fares, K.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego California 92121 / US
 [2013/43]
Representative(s)Tomkins & Co
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[2019/33]
Former [2013/43]Catesby, Olivia Joanne , et al
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date11813844.514.12.2011
[2019/33]
WO2011US64980
Priority number, dateUS2010096819014.12.2010         Original published format: US 968190
[2013/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012082944
Date:21.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2652874
Date:23.10.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2012
[2013/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2652874
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:H03K19/0185, H03K19/003, H04L25/02
[2013/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PRÄEEMPHASEVERFAHREN FÜR ON-CHIP-SPANNUNGSGESTEUERTE TREIBER MIT ASYMMETRISCHER TERMINIERUNG[2013/43]
English:PRE-EMPHASIS TECHNIQUE FOR ON-CHIP VOLTAGE-DRIVEN SINGLE-ENDED-TERMINATION DRIVERS[2013/43]
French:TECHNIQUE DE PRÉACCENTUATION POUR CIRCUITS D'ATTAQUE À TERMINAISON ASYMÉTRIQUE COMMANDÉS EN TENSION SUR PUCE[2013/43]
Entry into regional phase17.05.2013National basic fee paid 
17.05.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
17.05.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/43]
22.01.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.03.2019
12.03.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
04.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.2019Fee for grant paid
02.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.10.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
05.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
08.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
08.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
10.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US2009003463  (MURAOKA SATOSHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-5,18-26,39-44 * paragraphs [0006] - [0058]; figures 2,3,6,7 * [A] 7-13,16,17,28-34,37,38 [I] 6,14,15,27,35,36;
 [XI]US6281715  (DECLUE LARRY W [US] ET AL) [X] 1-6,14,15,18-27,35,36,39-44 * column 4, line 17 - column 9, line 63; figures 2,6 * [I] 7-13,16,17,28-34,37,38
ExaminationUS7265587
 US6514839
 US2009003463
 US6281715