EP2597947 - COMPOSITION FOR PRESERVING PLATELETS AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 13.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biovec Transfusion, LLC 980 N. Michigan Avenue Suite 1800 Chicago, IL 60611 / US | [2013/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEHGAL, Lakshman, R. 33671 Windlass Drive Monarch Beach, CA 92629 / US | [2013/23] | Representative(s) | Rees, Kerry, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Brand, Thomas Louis WP Thompson 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11814977.2 | 12.07.2011 | WO2011US43669 | Priority number, date | US20100368078P | 27.07.2010 Original published format: US 368078 P | [2013/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012018484 | Date: | 09.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2597947 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/02, C12N5/078 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
A01N1/0215 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR KONSERVIERUNG VON BLUTPLÄTTCHEN UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/23] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR PRESERVING PLATELETS AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF | [2013/23] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR CONSERVER LES PLAQUETTES ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION DE CELLE-CI | [2013/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 21.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/27] | 27.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   01.08.2016 | 31.07.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO0004930 (COBE LAB [US]) [X] 1,3,11,12 * page 16, line 14 - line 15 * * page 21, paragraph 2nd; claims 1,15, 20, 26 * * page 26 - page 29 * [Y] 1-15 [I] 1-15; | [XYI]WO03090794 (GAMBRO INC [US]) [X] 1,11,12 * page 4, paragraph 1st; claims 1, 23-25 * * page 8 - page 11 * * page 12, line 1 - line 3 * * page 15, paragraph 4th; example 3 * [Y] 1-15 [I] 1-15; | [IY]WO2006076401 (BIOVEC LLC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * [Y] 1-15; | [IY]US2009253115 (SEHGAL LAKSHMAN R [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * [Y] 1-15 | International search | [Y]US2009253115 (SEHGAL LAKSHMAN R [US], et al); | [Y]US6548241 (MCBURNEY LAURA [US], et al); | [A]US2003215785 (GOODRICH LAURA [US], et al); | [A]US5378601 (GEPNER-PUSZKIN ELENA [US]) |