Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2658464

EP2658464 - PREDICTION OF ATRIAL WALL ELECTRICAL RECONNECTION BASED ON CONTACT FORCE MEASURED DURING RF ABLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.12.2019
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.08.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.01.2020 [2020/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
St. Jude Medical International Holding S.à r.l.
Regus Center
26 boulevard Royal
2449 Luxembourg / LU
[2018/42]
Former [2016/37]For all designated states
St. Jude Medical International Holding S.à r.l.
4, rue Dicks
1417 Luxembourg / LU
Former [2015/08]For all designated states
St. Jude Medical Luxembourg Holding S.à.r.l.
4 rue Dicks
1417 Luxembourg / LU
Former [2013/45]For all designated states
Endosense SA
Chemin du Grand-Puits 42
1217 Meyrin / CH
Inventor(s)01 / LAMBERT, Hendrik
c/o Endosense S.A.
Chemin du Grand-Puits 42
1217 Meyrin / CH
02 / OLSTAD, Stuart, J.
c/o Patterson Thuente Christensen Pedersen P.A.
4800 IDS Center
80 South Eighth Street
Minneapolis, MN 55402-2100 / US
03 / FREMONT, Olivier B.
c/o Endosense S.A.
Chemin du Grand-Puits 42
1217 Meyrin / CH
 [2019/07]
Former [2013/45]01 / LAMBERT, Hendrik
c/o Endosense S.A.
Chemin du Grand-Puits 42
CH-1217 Meyrin / CH
02 / OLSTAD, Stuart, J.
c/o Patterson Thuente Christensen Pedersen P.A.
4800 IDS Center
80 South Eighth Street
Minneapolis, MN 55402-2100 / US
03 / FREMONT, Olivier B.
c/o Endosense S.A.
Chemin du Grand-Puits 42
CH-1217 Meyrin / CH
Representative(s)Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
[2019/07]
Former [2013/45]Schohe, Stefan
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date11815655.327.12.2011
[2019/07]
WO2011US67391
Priority number, dateUS201061427425P27.12.2010         Original published format: US 201061427425 P
US201061427423P27.12.2010         Original published format: US 201061427423 P
[2013/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012092275
Date:05.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2658464
Date:06.11.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2012
[2013/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2658464
Date:13.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/14, A61B5/107, G06F19/00, // A61B34/30, A61B90/00
[2018/35]
Former International [2013/45]A61B18/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORHERSAGE DER ELEKTRISCHEN WIEDERVERBINDUNG EINER VORHOFWAND AUF BASIS DER WÄHREND EINER RF-ABLATION GEMESSENEN KONTAKTKRAFT[2013/45]
English:PREDICTION OF ATRIAL WALL ELECTRICAL RECONNECTION BASED ON CONTACT FORCE MEASURED DURING RF ABLATION[2013/45]
French:PRÉVISION DE RECONNEXION ÉLECTRIQUE DE PAROI AURICULAIRE BASÉE SUR LA FORCE DE CONTACT MESURÉE AU COURS D'UNE ABLATION RADIOFRÉQUENCE[2013/45]
Entry into regional phase24.07.2013National basic fee paid 
24.07.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
24.07.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/45]
03.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2018Fee for grant paid
21.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18215165.4  / EP3482708
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.05.2016
Opposition(s)14.11.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
10.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL13.02.2019
AT13.02.2019
CZ13.02.2019
DK13.02.2019
EE13.02.2019
ES13.02.2019
FI13.02.2019
HR13.02.2019
LT13.02.2019
LV13.02.2019
NL13.02.2019
PL13.02.2019
RO13.02.2019
RS13.02.2019
SE13.02.2019
SK13.02.2019
SM13.02.2019
BG13.05.2019
NO13.05.2019
GR14.05.2019
IS13.06.2019
PT13.06.2019
[2020/03]
Former [2019/52]AL13.02.2019
CZ13.02.2019
DK13.02.2019
EE13.02.2019
ES13.02.2019
FI13.02.2019
HR13.02.2019
LT13.02.2019
LV13.02.2019
NL13.02.2019
PL13.02.2019
RO13.02.2019
RS13.02.2019
SE13.02.2019
SK13.02.2019
SM13.02.2019
BG13.05.2019
NO13.05.2019
GR14.05.2019
IS13.06.2019
PT13.06.2019
Former [2019/49]AL13.02.2019
CZ13.02.2019
DK13.02.2019
EE13.02.2019
ES13.02.2019
FI13.02.2019
HR13.02.2019
LT13.02.2019
LV13.02.2019
NL13.02.2019
RO13.02.2019
RS13.02.2019
SE13.02.2019
SK13.02.2019
BG13.05.2019
NO13.05.2019
GR14.05.2019
IS13.06.2019
PT13.06.2019
Former [2019/48]DK13.02.2019
ES13.02.2019
FI13.02.2019
HR13.02.2019
LT13.02.2019
LV13.02.2019
NL13.02.2019
RS13.02.2019
SE13.02.2019
BG13.05.2019
NO13.05.2019
GR14.05.2019
IS13.06.2019
PT13.06.2019
Former [2019/47]ES13.02.2019
FI13.02.2019
HR13.02.2019
LT13.02.2019
LV13.02.2019
NL13.02.2019
RS13.02.2019
SE13.02.2019
BG13.05.2019
NO13.05.2019
GR14.05.2019
IS13.06.2019
PT13.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI13.02.2019
HR13.02.2019
LT13.02.2019
LV13.02.2019
NL13.02.2019
RS13.02.2019
SE13.02.2019
BG13.05.2019
NO13.05.2019
GR14.05.2019
IS13.06.2019
PT13.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI13.02.2019
LT13.02.2019
NL13.02.2019
SE13.02.2019
BG13.05.2019
NO13.05.2019
GR14.05.2019
PT13.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI13.02.2019
LT13.02.2019
NL13.02.2019
SE13.02.2019
NO13.05.2019
GR14.05.2019
PT13.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI13.02.2019
LT13.02.2019
NL13.02.2019
SE13.02.2019
NO13.05.2019
PT13.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI13.02.2019
LT13.02.2019
NO13.05.2019
PT13.06.2019
Cited inInternational search[X]US2010298826  (LEO GIOVANNI [CH], et al) [X] 9-11 * figures 1,10,11,24 * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0121] *;
 [A]US2009306643  (PAPPONE CARLO [IT], et al) [A] 9-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2007109171  (MICROCUBE LLC [US], et al) [A] 9-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6322558  (TAYLOR JUNIUS E [US], et al) [A] 9-11 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2010298826