EP2664226 - METHOD OF MAKING AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE HAVING A LIQUID CRYSTAL POLYMER SOLDER MASK LAMINATED TO AN INTERCONNECT LAYER STACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/47] | METHOD OF MAKING AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE HAVING A LIQUID CRYSTAL POLYMER SOLDER MASK LAMINATED TO AN INTERCONNECT LAYER STACK AND RELATED DEVICES | ||
[2019/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harris Corporation 1025 West Nasa Blvd., MS A-11I Melbourne, FL 32919 / US | [2013/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RENDEK, Louis Joseph, Jr. 1320 Cape Sable Drive Melbourne, Florida 32904 / US | 02 /
WEATHERSPOON, Michael 2108 Maeve Circle West Melbourne Florida 32904 / US | 03 /
RODRIGUEZ, Casey Philip 115 Tradewinds Terrace Indialantic Florida 32903 / US | 04 /
NICOL, David 3369 Poseidon Way Melbourne Florida 32903 / US | [2013/47] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/43] | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/47] | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11815823.7 | 20.12.2011 | [2019/43] | WO2011US66163 | Priority number, date | US201113007035 | 14.01.2011 Original published format: US201113007035 | [2013/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012096765 | Date: | 19.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2664226 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2664226 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/34, H01L23/498 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
H01L23/49894 (EP,KR,US);
H01L23/3157 (EP,KR,US);
H01L24/83 (US);
H01L23/49822 (EP,KR,US);
H01L24/11 (EP,KR,US);
H01L24/13 (EP,KR,US);
H01L24/33 (KR,US);
H01L24/94 (EP,KR,US);
H01L25/0657 (EP,KR,US);
H05K3/281 (EP,KR,US);
H05K3/3452 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/0401 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05647 (EP,US);
H01L2224/11422 (EP,US);
H01L2224/1148 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13021 (EP,US);
H01L2224/131 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16145 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16237 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81191 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81815 (EP,US);
H01L2224/94 (EP,US);
H01L2225/06513 (EP,US);
H01L2225/06568 (EP,US);
H01L24/16 (EP,US);
H01L24/81 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01327 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H05K1/0306 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0141 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10674 (EP,US);
H05K2203/063 (EP,US);
H05K3/3436 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49144 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49156 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49165 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/05647, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/131, H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81815, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/94, H01L2224/81 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/05099 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/05599 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/13099 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/13599 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/29099 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/29599 (US,EP);
H01L2924/01327, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG MIT EINER AUF EINEN VERBINDUNGSSCHICHTSTAPEL LAMINIERTEN FLÜSSIGKRISTALLPOLYMERLÖTMASKE | [2019/21] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE HAVING A LIQUID CRYSTAL POLYMER SOLDER MASK LAMINATED TO AN INTERCONNECT LAYER STACK | [2019/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE COMPORTANT UN MASQUE DE SOUDURE POLYMÈRE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES STRATIFIÉ SUR UN EMPILAGE DE COUCHES D'INTERCONNEXION | [2019/21] |
Former [2013/47] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG MIT EINER AUF EINEN VERBINDUNGSSCHICHTSTAPEL LAMINIERTEN FLÜSSIGKRISTALLPOLYMERLÖTMASKE UND ENTSPRECHENDE VORRICHTUNGEN | ||
Former [2013/47] | METHOD OF MAKING AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE HAVING A LIQUID CRYSTAL POLYMER SOLDER MASK LAMINATED TO AN INTERCONNECT LAYER STACK AND RELATED DEVICES | ||
Former [2013/47] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE COMPORTANT UN MASQUE DE SOUDURE POLYMÈRE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES STRATIFIÉ SUR UN EMPILAGE DE COUCHES D'INTERCONNEXION, ET DISPOSITIFS ASSOCIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/47] | 21.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2019 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2011 | AL | 23.10.2019 | AT | 23.10.2019 | CY | 23.10.2019 | CZ | 23.10.2019 | DK | 23.10.2019 | EE | 23.10.2019 | ES | 23.10.2019 | FI | 23.10.2019 | HR | 23.10.2019 | IT | 23.10.2019 | LT | 23.10.2019 | LV | 23.10.2019 | MC | 23.10.2019 | MK | 23.10.2019 | MT | 23.10.2019 | NL | 23.10.2019 | PL | 23.10.2019 | RO | 23.10.2019 | RS | 23.10.2019 | SE | 23.10.2019 | SI | 23.10.2019 | SK | 23.10.2019 | SM | 23.10.2019 | TR | 23.10.2019 | IE | 20.12.2019 | LU | 20.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | BG | 23.01.2020 | NO | 23.01.2020 | GR | 24.01.2020 | IS | 23.02.2020 | PT | 24.02.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/26] | HU | 20.12.2011 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
MT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
TR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 20.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 20.12.2011 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
MT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 20.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 20.12.2011 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 20.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 20.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 20.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 20.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.12.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | ES | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 23.10.2019 | |
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 23.10.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6221769 (DHONG SANG HOO [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US2005067686 (USUI RYOSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0050] , [0054] , [0055]; figures 4,5,6 *; | [A]WO2008102692 (SONY CHEM & INF DEVICE CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [I]EP2001274 (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO [JP]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 29] , [0 33] , [0038] - [0040]; figures 25, 26, 29 *; | [A]US2009084595 (PARK JUNG-HWAN [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0048] - [0052] - [0 60] - [0062] - [0074]; figures 17-22 *; | [A]US2009250253 (PARK HO-SIK [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0013] , [0 49] - [0053] - [0 57]; figures 5-8 *; | [A]EP2237652 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0045] , [0 47] , [0071] , [ 103]; figures 3,4 * |